Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2944339

EP2944339 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING REPLACEMENT FLUID AND PLASMA FLOW RATES FOR RED BLOOD CELL EXCHANGE PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fenwal, Inc.
3 Corporate Drive
Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US
[2015/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Ali, Zahra R.
1231 Deerfield Parkway
Apt. 202
Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US
02 / Stude, David E.
616 N. Hough St.
Unit B
Barrington, IL 60010 / US
 [2015/47]
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2015/47]
Application number, filing date15166708.607.05.2015
[2015/47]
Priority number, dateUS20141427498212.05.2014         Original published format: US201414274982
[2015/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2944339
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2944339
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/34, A61M1/36
[2015/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/26]
Former [2015/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ERSATZFLUIDSTRÖMUNGSRATE UND DER PLASMASTRÖMUNGSRATE VON AUSTAUSCHVERFAHREN VON ROTEN BLUTZELLEN[2015/47]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING REPLACEMENT FLUID AND PLASMA FLOW RATES FOR RED BLOOD CELL EXCHANGE PROCEDURES[2015/47]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DETERMINER LES DÉBITS DU FLUIDE DE REMPLACEMENT ET DE PLASMA POUR DES PROCÉDURES D'ÉCHANGE DE GLOBULES ROUGES[2017/10]
Former [2015/47]SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTERMINER LES DÉBITS DU FLUIDE DE REMPLACEMENT ET DE PLASMA POUR DES PROCÉDURES D'ÉCHANGE DE GLOBULES ROUGES
Examination procedure18.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/26]
09.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2017Fee for grant paid
13.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
[2019/06]
Former [2018/40]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XDI]US2013267884  (BOGGS DANIEL R [US], et al) [XD] 1 * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 10 * * page 5, paragraph 46 * * page 6, paragraph 50 - page 10, paragraph 108 * * page 10, paragraph 108 * * figures 1,3,4 * [I] 8,9,15;
 [XI]US2004249332  (BAINBRIDGE MARLENE [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, paragraph 88 - page 6, column 1, line 4 * * page 28, paragraph 264 - paragraph 265 * * page 29, line 11, paragraph 275 - line l, paragraph 275 * * page 29, paragraph 277 - page 30, line 7, paragraph 280 * * page 31, paragraph 286 * * figures 1,2C,2D3,8B * [I] 8,9,15;
 [AD]US2009211987  (MIN KYUNGYOON [US]) [AD] 1,9 * page 2, paragraph 13 - page 3, paragraph 18 * * page 4, paragraph 30 - page 5, paragraph 38 * * figures 1,3,4 *
by applicantUS2009211987
 US2013267884
 US5868696