Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3090685

EP3090685 - PEDOMETER AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING MOTION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd.
Rue des Sors 3
2074 Marin / CH
[2016/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Fasel, Benedikt
Chemin des Ramiers 20
1022 Chavannes / CH
02 / Aminian, Kamiar
Gregnolet 5
1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH
 [2016/45]
Representative(s)Goulette, Ludivine , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/45]Gilligmann, Benoît Philippe , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date15167030.408.05.2015
[2016/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3090685
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/11, G01C22/00
[2016/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHRITTZÄHLER UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON BEWEGUNGSDATEN[2016/45]
English:PEDOMETER AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING MOTION DATA[2016/45]
French:PODOMÈTRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE DONNÉES DE MOUVEMENT[2016/45]
Examination procedure10.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/46]
16.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/46]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2014109982  (VALENCELL INC [US]) [X] 1,2,12,13,16 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 27 * * page 10, line 4 - line 5 * * figure 3 * [Y] 3-5,7-9,14,15 [I] 6,10,11;
 [Y]US2014257766  (PODURI SAMEERA [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] * * figure 6 *;
 [A]US2009163835  (LOGAN BETH [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040]; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2013191034  (WEAST AARON B [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0109] * * figure 9 *
 [Y]  - DOVAL B ET AL, "Fundamental frequency estimation and tracking using maximum likelihood harmonic matching and HMMs", 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). ORLANDO, FL, MAY 13 - 17, 2002; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP)], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (19930427), doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1993.319095, ISBN 978-0-7803-7402-7, pages 221 - 224vol.1, XP031983967 [Y] 3-5,14,15 * Section "Theory" * * Section "Implementation" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1993.319095
 [A]  - VALÉRIE RENAUDIN ET AL, "Step Length Estimation Using Handheld Inertial Sensors", SENSORS, CH, (20121225), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.3390/s120708507, ISSN 1424-8220, pages 8507 - 8525, XP055227893 [A] 10,11 * Sections 1-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s120708507
 [A]  - MANNINI A ET AL, "On-line classification of human activity and estimation of walk-run speed from acceleration data using support vector machines", ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY,EMBC, 2011 ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE, IEEE, (20110830), doi:10.1109/IEMBS.2011.6090896, ISBN 978-1-4244-4121-1, pages 3302 - 3305, XP032319466 [A] 10,11 * Section II *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2011.6090896
by applicantUS2013085711