EP2944598 - DOOR COUPLER WITH FLEXIBLY POSITIONABLE COUPLER ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wittur Holding GmbH Rohrbachstrasse 26-30 85259 Wiedenzhausen / DE | [2015/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mittermayr, Franz Loich 22 3211 Loich / AT | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin Patent- und Rechtsanwalt Am Stein 10 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [2022/27] |
Former [2015/47] | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin Patent- und Rechtsanwalt Donaustrasse 6 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 15167365.4 | 12.05.2015 | [2015/47] | Priority number, date | DE201420102232U | 13.05.2014 Original published format: DE 202014102232 U | DE201420102534U | 28.05.2014 Original published format: DE 202014102534 U | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2944598 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2944598 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B66B13/12 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
B66B13/12 (EP,US);
B66B19/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2015/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TÜRKOPPLER MIT FLEXIBEL POSITIONIERBAREN KOPPLERELEMENTEN | [2015/47] | English: | DOOR COUPLER WITH FLEXIBLY POSITIONABLE COUPLER ELEMENTS | [2015/47] | French: | COUPLEUR DE PORTE AVEC DES ÉLÉMENTS D'ACCOUPLEMENT POSITIONNABLES DE MANIÈRE FLEXIBLE | [2015/47] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 23.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22183100.1 / EP4129879 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | NL | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 06.07.2022 | |
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 06.07.2022 | |
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 06.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]ES1057054U (TECNOLAMA S A [ES]) [X] 1,6,8-11,14,15 * figures 1, 2 * * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 35 * [I] 2-5,7,12,13; | [A]CN2885802Y (SUZHOU SAFE ELEVATOR COMPONENT [CN]) [A] 1-15* figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US2012305336 (WALKER WILLY [CH]) [X] 1-3,8,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0035] * [I] 4-7,11-14 | by applicant | WO2005077808 | EP2287104 |