Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3094008

EP3094008 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DATA TRANSMISSION ON ENERGY TRANSMITTING ELECTRICAL LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fronius International GmbH
Froniusstraße 1
4643 Pettenbach / AT
[2016/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Fasthuber, Christian
Oberhaider Straße 60
4600 Wels / AT
02 / Lohninger, Ewald
Steindorf 162
4863 Seewalchen am Attersee / AT
03 / Hofer, Bernd
Forsthausstraße 6
4654 Bad Wimsbach / AT
 [2016/46]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Pinter & Weiss OG
Prinz-Eugen-Straße 70
1040 Wien / AT
[2016/46]
Application number, filing date15167834.915.05.2015
[2016/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3094008
Date:16.11.2016
Language:DE
[2016/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3094008
Date:16.08.2017
Language:DE
[2017/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B3/54, G08C19/00, H02J50/00
[2016/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/46]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DATENÜBERTRAGUNG AUF ENERGIEÜBERTRAGENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN LEITUNGEN[2016/46]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DATA TRANSMISSION ON ENERGY TRANSMITTING ELECTRICAL LINES[2016/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES SUR DES LIGNES ÉLECTRIQUES TRANSMETTANT DE L'ÉNERGIE[2016/46]
Examination procedure15.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/46]
06.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2017Fee for grant paid
23.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.05.2018  25.09.2018  WITHDRAWN
SMA Solar Technology AG
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
 [2018/44]
Former [2018/25]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2018   
SMA Solar Technology AG
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
01.06.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.10.2018Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
26.10.2018Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
IE15.05.2018
LU15.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/19]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
IE15.05.2018
LU15.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
LU15.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/40]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/25]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE102006059689  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,12,16 * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0032] * [Y] 10,11 [I] 3-8,14,15;
 [YD]DE102011007912  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [YD] 10,11 * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] *;
 [X]US6507573  (BRANDT FRANK [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,12,14 * figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 20 *;
 [X]US2003018422  (AKIYAMA SUSUMU [JP]) [X] 1,2,12 * paragraph [0042] * * figure 3 *;
 [A]CA2223666  (PIERCY RAYMOND [CA], et al) [A] 1-16
by applicantDE102011007912
OppositionWO2013003066
 WO2007135497
 US2012314747
 US2012314781
 DE102006059689
 DE102011007912
 US2003018422
    - "the whats and whys of spresd spectrum systems", R. C. DIXON, Spread Spectrum Systems, (19760000), page 1-53,140-145, XP055491661
    - "Mehrfachmodulation", K. LANGE et al., Taschenbuch der Hochfrequenztechnik, (19860000), pages 45-50,54 - 62, XP055491668
    - I. KHARAGPUR, "Lesson 19 Maximum Likelihood Detection and Correlation Receiver", in Web Lectures Module 4 Signal Representation and Baseband Processing, (20091231), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://nptel.ac.in/courses/1 1 7105077/19, XP055491675
    - "digitale modulationsverfahren", K. DAVID et al., Digitale Mobilfunksysteme, (19960000), pages 155-157,205-206,211- - 212, XP055491677