Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2963895

EP2963895 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING DIGITAL CONTENT FROM A PERSONAL COMPUTER TO A MOBILE HANDSET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019Deletion: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2016/01]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Ho, Edwin
905 Amarillo Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
02 / Wai, King, Sun
4506 Sargent Avenue
Castro Valley, CA 94546 / US
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/01]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15167905.702.01.2008
[2016/01]
Priority number, dateUS20070879416P08.01.2007         Original published format: US 879416 P
US2007078871120.04.2007         Original published format: US 788711
[2016/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2963895
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, G06F15/16
[2016/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG DIGITALER INHALTE VON EINEM COMPUTER AUF EIN MOBILTELEFON[2016/01]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING DIGITAL CONTENT FROM A PERSONAL COMPUTER TO A MOBILE HANDSET[2016/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE TRANSFÉRER UN CONTENU NUMÉRIQUE D'UN ORDINATEUR PERSONNEL À UN COMBINÉ MOBILE[2016/01]
Examination procedure15.05.2015Examination requested  [2016/01]
06.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2019Date of oral proceedings
20.02.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination26.04.2019Appeal received No.  T2164/19
27.06.2019Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08705466.4  / EP2118768
Divisional application(s)EP18153371.2  / EP3331220
EP18153375.3  / EP3331221
EP18153378.7  / EP3331222
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
15.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
15.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
15.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
26.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
23.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006173974  (TANG VICTOR [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0120] *;
 [A]US6810080  (WISE ADRIAN PHILIP [GB]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 58 - line 67 *;
 [A]US2006206565  (GANESAN PRASANNA [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006008180  (WAKELAND CARL K [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005064945  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; GENTRIC PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005109224  (MOVE NETWORKS [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - GRAHAM M CAMPBELL ET AL, "Dig-Music: An on Demand Digital Musical Selection System Utilizing CATV Facilities", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19820801), vol. 53, no. 3, ISSN 0098-3063, pages xviii - xxvi, XP011180150 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - G. Essl, M. Rohs, (2006), Mobile stk for symbian os, URL: web.eecs.umich.edu/~gessl/georg_papers/icmc2006mobilestk, (20150902), XP002743853 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *