Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2949335

EP2949335 - LOW FREQUENCY GLATIRAMER ACETATE THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019New entry: Appeal number 
05.07.2019New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YEDA RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LTD.
P.O. Box 95
76100 Rehovot / IL
[2015/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Klinger, Ety
16 Agadati Street
39930 Tel Aviv / IL
 [2015/49]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2015/49]
Application number, filing date15171065.419.08.2010
[2015/49]
Priority number, dateUS20090274687P20.08.2009         Original published format: US 274687 P
US20100337612P11.02.2010         Original published format: US 337612 P
[2015/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2949335
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2949335
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/02, A61K38/16, A61P25/28, A61K38/07, A61K9/00, A61K31/785
[2016/43]
Former International [2015/49]A61K38/02, A61K38/16, A61P25/28, A61K38/07, A61K9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
Extension statesBA08.06.2015
ME08.06.2015
RS08.06.2015
TitleGerman:NIEDRIGFREQUENTE GLATIRAMERAZETATTHERAPIE[2015/49]
English:LOW FREQUENCY GLATIRAMER ACETATE THERAPY[2015/49]
French:THÉRAPIE À L'ACÉTATE DE GLATIRAMÈRE À BASSE FRÉQUENCE[2015/49]
Examination procedure08.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
21.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
20.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2016Fee for grant paid
28.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.12.2016Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10810282.3  / EP2405749
EP13166080.5  / EP2630962
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.10.2017  09.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan)
Building 4, Trident Place
Mosquito Way, Hatfield
GB-Hertfordshire AL 10 9UL / GB
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP, et al
MXL The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
 02  04.10.2017  09.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.10.2017  13.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Alvogen IPCo S.a.r.l.
5 rue Heienhaff
1736 Senningerberg / LU
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  04.10.2017  13.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 05  04.10.2017  13.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
 06  27.11.2017  27.11.2017  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Mylan Teoranta Trading as Mylan Institutional
Inverin
H91 Co. Galway / IE
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP
APC The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
 [2018/08]
Former [2018/01]
Opponent(s)01  03.10.2017  09.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan)
Building 4, Trident Place
Mosquito Way, Hatfield
GB-Hertfordshire AL 10 9UL / GB
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP, et al
MXL The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
 02  04.10.2017  09.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.10.2017  13.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Alvogen IPCo S.a.r.l.
5 rue Heienhaff
1736 Senningerberg / LU
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  04.10.2017  13.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 05  04.10.2017  13.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
 06  27.11.2017   
Mylan Teoranta Trading as Mylan Institutional
Inverin
H91 Co. Galway / IE
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP
APC The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2017/47]
Opponent(s)01  03.10.2017  09.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan)
Building 4, Trident Place
Mosquito Way, Hatfield
GB-Hertfordshire AL 10 9UL / GB
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP, et al
MXL The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
 02  04.10.2017  09.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.10.2017  13.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Alvogen IPCo S.a.r.l.
5 rue Heienhaff
1736 Senningerberg / LU
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  04.10.2017  13.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 05  04.10.2017  13.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
Former [2017/46]
Opponent(s)01  03.10.2017  09.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan)
Building 4, Trident Place
Mosquito Way, Hatfield
GB-Hertfordshire AL 10 9UL / GB
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP, et al
MXL The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
 02  04.10.2017  09.10.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.10.2017   
Alvogen IPCo S.a.r.l.
5 rue Heienhaff
1736 Senningerberg / LU
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 04  04.10.2017   
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 05  04.10.2017   
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
09.11.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.05.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
13.05.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.05.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition04.07.2019Appeal received No.  T1343/19
05.04.2019Appeal received No.  T1343/19
02.04.2019Appeal received No.  T1343/19
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL04.01.2017
GB21.11.2017
[2018/21]
Former [2017/40]NL04.01.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007161566  (PINCHASI IRIT [IL]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0037]; example 1; claims 1,3 *;
 [A]  - FLECHTER S ET AL, "Comparison of glatiramer acetate (Copaxone(R)) and interferon beta-1b (Betaferon(R)) in multiple sclerosis patients: An open-label 2-year follow-up", JOURNAL OF THE NEUROLOGICAL SCIENCES, (20020515), vol. 197, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-510X, pages 51 - 55, XP002679780 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-510X(02)00047-3
 [A]  - FLECHTER SHLOMO ET AL, "Copolymer 1 (glatiramer acetate) in relapsing forms of multiple sclerosis: open multicenter study of alternate-day administration.", CLINICAL NEUROPHARMACOLOGY 2002 JAN-FEB LNKD- PUBMED:11852290, (200201), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 0362-5664, pages 11 - 15, XP009161076 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * "Comparison of daily with alternate-day treatment" on page 14 and "Drug Supply" on page 12 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002826-200201000-00002
 [A]  - KHAN O ET AL, "Randomized, prospective, rater-blinded, four-year, pilot study to compare the effect of daily versus every - other - day injections in relapsing -remitting multiple", MULT.SCLER. (14, SUPPL. 1, S296, 2008) 0 REF. ISSN: 1352-4585 AV - WAYNE STATE UNIV, SCH MED, DETROIT, MI, USA., (2008), XP009161078 [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - CAON CHRISTINA ET AL, "Randomized, Prospective, Rater-Blinded, Four Year Pilot Study To Compare the Effect of Daily Versus Every Other Day Glatiramer Acetate 20 mg Subcutaneous Injections in RRMS", NEUROLOGY, & 61ST ANNUAL MEETING OF AMERICAN-ACADEMY-OF-NEUROLOGY; SEATTLE, WA, USA; APRIL 28 -29, 2009, (200903), vol. 72, no. 11, Suppl. 3, ISSN 0028-3878, page A317, XP009161100 [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [I]  - COHEN J A ET AL, "Randomized, double-blind, dose-comparison study of glatiramer acetate in relapsing-remitting MS.", NEUROLOGY 20 MAR 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17372130, (20070320), vol. 68, no. 12, ISSN 1526-632X, pages 939 - 944, XP002679784 [I] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1212/01.wnl.0000257109.61671.06
 [A]  - SIMPSON DENE ET AL, "Glatiramer acetate: A review of its use in relapsing-remitting multiple sclerosis.", CNS DRUGS, (2002), vol. 16, no. 12, ISSN 1172-7047, pages 825 - 850, XP009161077 [A] 1-15 * "Therapeutic efficacy" on page 835 and "Dosage and Administration" on page 844 * * table II *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00023210-200216120-00004
 [I]  - Anonymous, "Teva Provides Update on FORTE Trial", (20080707), Internet, URL: http://ir.tevapharm.com/phoenix.zhtml?c=73925&p=irol-newsArticle&ID=1554743, (20150831), XP002743817 [I] 1-15 * abstract *
 [I]  - YONG WEE V ET AL, "Immunological Responses to Different Doses of Glatiramer Acetate in MS: Analyses from the FORTE Trial", NEUROLOGY, & 61ST ANNUAL MEETING OF AMERICAN-ACADEMY-OF-NEUROLOGY; SEATTLE, WA, USA; APRIL 28 -29, 2009, (200903), vol. 72, no. 11, Suppl. 3, ISSN 0028-3878, page A39, XP002743818 [I] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantUS2002055466
 US2005014694
 US2002077278
 US2003004099
 US2002037848
 US6514938
 WO0160392
 WO0027417
 WO0197846
 US2008013146
 WO2009070298
 US2009149541
    - G. COMI ET AL., "European/Canadian Multicenter, Double-Blind, Randomized, Placebo-Controlled Study of the Effects of Glatiramer Acetere on Magnetic Resonance Imaging-Measured Disease Activity and Burden in Patients with Relapsing Multiple Sclerosis", ANN. NEUROL., (2001), vol. 49, doi:doi:10.1002/ana.64, pages 290 - 297, XP009042363

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.64
    - POSER ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (198303), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 227 - 230
    - ANN NEUROL, (2005), vol. 58, pages 840 - 846
    - KANSARA V; MITRA A; WU Y, "Subcutaneous Delivery", DRUG DELIV TECHNOL, (200906), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 38 - 42
    - LUCA DURELLI, J NEUROL, (2003), no. 4, page 250
otherUS8969302
 US8399413
 EP2405749
    - Y.-C. J. WANG, "PARENTERAL FORMULATIONS OF PROTEINS AND PEPTIDES: STABILITY AND STABILIZERS", J. Parent. Sci. Techn., (19880000), vol. 42, no. 2S, pages S4 - S26, XP000984636
OppositionWO2007081975
 WO2011022063
    - "View of NCT01067521", ClinicalTrials.gov archive, (20100210), XP055508500
    - ClinicalTrials.gov archive, History of NCT01067521
    - "FDA label Rebif PI", www.accessdata.fda.gov, (20020308), URL: https://www.accessdata.fda.gov/drugsatfda_docs/)abe)/2002/ifnbs er030702LB.pdf, XP055508530
    - J.J Jessop, "Review and Evaluation of Pharmacology Toxicology Data", Original NDA Review, NDA 20-622, Copolymer-1 for treatment of relaps- ing-remitting multiple sclerosis, (19960000), XP055508552
    - Grennero Alfonso, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Easton, Pennsylvania, Mack Publishing Company, (19900000), pages 1813 - 1827, XP055508569
    - KHAN O. et al., "Randomized, prospective, rater-blinded, four-year, pilot study to compare the effect of daily versus every-other-day glatiramer acetate 20 mg subcutaneous injections in relapsing- remitting multiple sclerosis", Multiple Sclerosis, (20080900), vol. 14, page S296, XP009161078
    - GAGNON L., "Every-Other-Day Dosing of Glatiramer Acetate Reduces Adverse Reactions with Comparable Efficacy to Daily Dosing", WCTRMS, (20080921), XP055508581

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/http://www.peervoice.com/every-other-day-dosing-glatiramer-acetate-reduces-adverse-reactions-comparable-efficacy-daily-dosing-presented-wctrms#
    - BEJAOUI K. et al., "There is no rebound worsening of multiple sclero- sis after stopping disease-modifying therapies", Multiple Sclerosis, (20080000), vol. 14, pages S31 - S32, XP055508582