blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2949335 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2949335



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 9431
09.07.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 7
04.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.07.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 3
14.05.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 10
14.05.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 7
13.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
13.05.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 14
13.05.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
13.05.2019 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.05.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
13.05.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
13.05.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
13.05.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
13.05.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
13.05.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.05.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.05.2019 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.05.2019 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.04.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.04.2019 General enquiry Opposition 2
04.04.2019 General enquiry Opposition 2
04.04.2019 General enquiry Opposition 2
04.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.04.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.04.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.04.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.03.2019 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.03.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
20.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
20.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
20.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
20.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
20.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
14.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.03.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
28.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 112
28.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 112
28.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 112
28.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 112
28.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 112
28.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 112
22.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.02.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 081 Opposition 60
22.02.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 082 Opposition 24
22.02.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 083 Opposition 11
22.02.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 084 Opposition 10
22.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.02.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
19.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
19.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
19.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
19.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
19.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
19.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
13.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
13.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
13.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
13.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
13.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
13.02.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
13.02.2019 Claims Opposition 1
13.02.2019 Claims Opposition 1
13.02.2019 Claims Opposition 1
13.02.2019 Claims Opposition 1
13.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.02.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 45
08.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 45
08.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 45
08.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 45
08.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 45
08.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 45
05.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 186
05.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 160
05.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 160
05.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 160
05.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 186
05.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 186
05.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 160
01.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.02.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 074 Opposition 25
01.02.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 075 Opposition 10
01.02.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 076 Opposition 6
01.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
01.02.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
30.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
30.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
30.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
30.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
28.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 26
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 26
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 34
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 34
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 26
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 34
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 056 Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 077 Opposition 6
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 078 Opposition 15
28.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 079 Opposition 6
28.01.2019 Claims Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Claims Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Claims Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Claims Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.01.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 25
28.01.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 25
28.01.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 25
28.01.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
25.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.01.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.01.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 272
21.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 272
21.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 272
21.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 272
21.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 272
21.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 272
08.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 067 Opposition 64
08.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 068 Opposition 15
08.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 069 Opposition 33
08.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 070 Opposition 2
08.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 071 Opposition 51
08.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 072 Opposition 65
08.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 073 Opposition 2
08.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
08.01.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 39
13.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
13.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
13.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
13.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
13.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
10.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.09.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.09.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
03.08.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.08.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.08.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
18.05.2018 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 018 Opposition 7
18.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 047 Opposition 14
18.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 048 Opposition 2
18.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 050 Opposition 16
18.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 051 Opposition 7
18.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 063 Opposition 13
18.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 064 Opposition 19
18.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 065 Opposition 8
18.05.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 066 Opposition 9
18.05.2018 Claims Opposition 1
18.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.05.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
18.05.2018 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 60
06.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 58
06.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 58
25.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 58
25.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 58
25.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 58
25.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 58
19.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.01.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 061 Opposition 53
18.01.2018 Citation in opposition procedure - 062 Opposition 3
18.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.01.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.12.2017 Communication of notices of intervention Opposition 1
18.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.11.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
27.11.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.11.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
27.11.2017 Intervention of the assumed infringer Opposition 33
27.11.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
14.11.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.11.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.11.2017 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.11.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
23.10.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.10.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.10.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
04.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 50
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 338
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 20
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 20
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 20
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 338
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 20
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 50
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 016 Opposition 12
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 017 Opposition 72
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 027 Opposition 12
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 034 Opposition 338
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 035 Opposition 1
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 041 Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 041 Opposition 4
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 044 Opposition 8
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 045 Opposition 8
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 046 Opposition 8
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 049 Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 057 Opposition 50
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 151
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
04.10.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 42
04.10.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 42
04.10.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 42
04.10.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
04.10.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 29
04.10.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
04.10.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
04.10.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
04.10.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
04.10.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
04.10.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 72
04.10.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 72
04.10.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
04.10.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
04.10.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
03.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 13
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 5
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 5
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 1
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 3
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 6
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 26
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 3
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 1
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 7
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 015 Opposition 1
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 019 Opposition 1
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 021 Opposition 4
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 022 Opposition 5
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 023 Opposition 2
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 036 Opposition 45
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 037 Opposition 4
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 038 Opposition 16
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 039 Opposition 12
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 040 Opposition 2
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 041 Opposition 2
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 042 Opposition 18
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 042 Opposition 9
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 042 Opposition 7
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 042 Opposition 8
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 042 Opposition 53
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 042 Opposition 17
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 042 Opposition 7
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 043 Opposition 1
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 052 Opposition 26
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 053 Opposition 6
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 054 Opposition 2
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 054 Opposition 2
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 054 Opposition 1
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 055 Opposition 26
03.10.2017 Citation in opposition procedure - 056 Opposition 2
03.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.10.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
03.10.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
03.10.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
25.01.2017 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
04.01.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
19.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.12.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 179
08.12.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.12.2016 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 42
06.12.2016 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 10
06.12.2016 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 32
06.12.2016 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 36
06.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.12.2016 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 26
06.12.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
06.12.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 14
06.12.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 12
28.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.11.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.11.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
28.11.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
28.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.10.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 44
27.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 44
19.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
20.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
20.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
23.05.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
23.05.2016 Annex Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 Annex Search / examination 22
23.05.2016 Annex Search / examination 71
23.05.2016 Annex Search / examination 28
23.05.2016 Annex Search / examination 16
23.05.2016 Annex Search / examination 15
23.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Description Search / examination 6
23.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
23.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
23.05.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.01.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 10
21.01.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.12.2015 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
04.11.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.10.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 European search report Search / examination 4
27.08.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
09.07.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
08.06.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
08.06.2015 Description Search / examination 43
08.06.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
08.06.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
18.03.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
18.03.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 50