Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2949335


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.10.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
29.10.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.10.2019 Change: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
11.10.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
04.10.2019 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  06.11.2019  [2019/45]
18.09.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
03.09.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
05.07.2019 New entry: Appeal number
05.07.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.05.2019 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
12.05.2019 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.05.2019 Change: Appeal number
10.05.2019 New entry: Appeal number
10.05.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
10.05.2019 Deletion: Appeal number
14.08.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
22.05.2018 Change: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.05.2018 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
19.01.2018 Intervention admissible published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
15.01.2018 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
01.12.2017 Opposition filed published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
08.11.2017 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
20.10.2017 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Opposition filed published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
07.12.2016 New entry: Observations by third parties
02.12.2016 (Expected) grant published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
30.11.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
30.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.10.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.09.2016 Change - classification published on  26.10.2016  [2016/43]
23.09.2016 Change - classification published on  26.10.2016  [2016/43]
16.09.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.08.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.05.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.02.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.01.2016 First examination report
18.01.2016 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.01.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.12.2015 First examination report
02.12.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
04.11.2015 Request for examination filed published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
07.07.2015 Change - representative
10.06.2015 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
10.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.06.2015 Change - representative