blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2949335 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201080036966 CN201610104429 CN201610878988 EP10810282 EP13166080 EP15171065 EP17157735 EP18179172



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019175494Global Dossier 13.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US201615380579 15.12.2016
US33761210 11.02.2010
US201815908441 28.02.2018
US201816165541 19.10.2018
US80668410 19.08.2010
US201815881495 26.01.2018
US201715642201 05.07.2017
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201816020591 27.06.2018
US201916272786 11.02.2019
US201715469758 27.03.2017
US201615148215 06.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019054013Global Dossier 21.02.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US201615380579 15.12.2016
US33761210 11.02.2010
US201815908441 28.02.2018
US201816165541 19.10.2018
US80668410 19.08.2010
US201715642201 05.07.2017
US201715811495 13.11.2017
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201816020591 27.06.2018
US201715469758 27.03.2017
US201615148215 06.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018311149Global Dossier 01.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US201816020591 27.06.2018
US201615380579 15.12.2016
US33761210 11.02.2010
US201815908441 28.02.2018
US80668410 19.08.2010
US201715469758 27.03.2017
US201615148215 06.05.2016
US201715642201 05.07.2017
US201715811495 13.11.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018185274Global Dossier 05.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US201615380579 15.12.2016
US33761210 11.02.2010
US201815908441 28.02.2018
US80668410 19.08.2010
US201715469758 27.03.2017
US201615148215 06.05.2016
US201715642201 05.07.2017
US201715811495 13.11.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018064639Global Dossier 08.03.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US201615380579 15.12.2016
US33761210 11.02.2010
US80668410 19.08.2010
US201715469758 27.03.2017
US201615148215 06.05.2016
US201715642201 05.07.2017
US201715811495 13.11.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017296464Global Dossier 19.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US201615380579 15.12.2016
US33761210 11.02.2010
US80668410 19.08.2010
US201715469758 27.03.2017
US201615148215 06.05.2016
US201715642201 05.07.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017196803Global Dossier 13.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US201615380579 15.12.2016
US33761210 11.02.2010
US80668410 19.08.2010
US201715469758 27.03.2017
US201615148215 06.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017095523Global Dossier 06.04.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US201615380579 15.12.2016
US33761210 11.02.2010
US80668410 19.08.2010
US201615148215 06.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016250251Global Dossier 01.09.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US33761210 11.02.2010
US80668410 19.08.2010
US201615148215 06.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015164977Global Dossier 18.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US33761210 11.02.2010
US80668410 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9402874Global Dossier 02.08.2016B2
US2015202247 23.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US33761210 11.02.2010
US201514673257 30.03.2015
US80668410 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9155776Global Dossier 13.10.2015B2
US2015250845 10.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201514630326 24.02.2015
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US201514720556 22.05.2015
US33761210 11.02.2010
US80668410 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8969302Global Dossier 03.03.2015B2
US2013165387 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US201313770677 19.02.2013
US33761210 11.02.2010
US80668410 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8399413Global Dossier 19.03.2013B2
US2011046065 24.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
US80668410 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8232250Global Dossier 31.07.2012B2
US2012071416 22.03.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201113308299 30.11.2011
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
US80668410 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20170123354Global Dossier 07.11.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20160038057Global Dossier 06.04.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140061559Global Dossier 21.05.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6038653BGlobal Dossier 07.12.2016B2
JP2013502415 24.01.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3409286Global Dossier 05.12.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
EP13166080 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3199172Global Dossier 11.07.2018B1
EP3199172 11.10.2017A8
EP3199172 02.08.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
EP13166080 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
EP17153450 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2630962Global Dossier 27.06.2018B1
EP2630962 28.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2405749Global Dossier 08.05.2013B1
EP2405749 22.08.2012A4
EP2405749 18.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107050423Global Dossier 18.08.2017A
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
CN201080036966 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102625657Global Dossier 01.08.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2760802Global Dossier 12.01.2016C
CA2760802 24.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2949335Global Dossier 04.01.2017B1
EP2949335 02.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
EP13166080 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2010284666B 06.12.2012B2
AU2010284666 22.09.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2876966 24.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
CA2760802 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1114537T 05.10.2016T1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1118529T 12.07.2017T1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
EP13166080 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2405749T 15.07.2013T3
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2630962T 23.07.2018T3
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2949335T 31.07.2017T3
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP13166080 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK3199172T 08.10.2018T3
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP13166080 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA019998 29.01.2016B9
EA019998 30.07.2014B1
EA201270292 28.12.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2424692T 07.10.2013T3
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1165959 14.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20130677T 11.10.2013T1
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20170056T 15.12.2017T2
HRP20170056T 24.03.2017T1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
EP15171065 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20181253T 02.11.2018T1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP13166080 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20181254T 25.01.2019T1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP17157735 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL218106D 30.04.2012D0
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL233468D 31.08.2014D0
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL251943D 29.06.2017D0
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ME01536 20.04.2014B
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ME02662 20.06.2017B
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
EP15171065 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2012002082 23.08.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ598661 22.02.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2630962T 31.12.2018T3
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
EP13166080 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2949335T 31.07.2017T3
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
EP15171065 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL3199172T 31.01.2019T3
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
EP13166080 19.08.2010
EP17157735 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
EP17153450 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS52885 28.02.2014B
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG178495 29.03.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2405749T 30.10.2013T1
Priority number Date
WO2010US02283 19.08.2010
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2630962T 30.10.2018T1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP13166080 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2949335T 31.05.2017T1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
EP15171065 19.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI3199172T 30.10.2018T1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP17157735 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SMT201700057 08.03.2017B
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
EP10810282 19.08.2010
EP13166080 19.08.2010
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011022063Global Dossier 24.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20120090044Global Dossier 16.08.2012A
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2017132773Global Dossier 03.08.2017A
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6169644BGlobal Dossier 26.07.2017B2
JP2015187125 29.10.2015A
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN105770855Global Dossier 20.07.2016A
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR077896 28.09.2011A1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR099078 29.06.2016A2
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT15421U 15.08.2017U1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ29723U 07.09.2016U1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ30474U 22.03.2017U1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202010018377U 25.02.2016U1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK201600003Y 12.02.2016Y3
DK201600003U 22.01.2016U1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EA032283 31.05.2019B1
EA201400394 30.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EA032287 31.05.2019B1
EA201691347 30.11.2016A3
EA201691347 31.10.2016A2
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2612001T 07.02.2018T4
ES2612001T 11.05.2017T3
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2688873T 07.11.2018T3
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2689711T 15.11.2018T3
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1218250 10.02.2017A1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE031282T 28.06.2017T2
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE039335T 28.12.2018T2
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
LT2630962T 25.10.2018T
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
LT2949335T 27.03.2017T
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
LT3199172T 25.10.2018T
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2405749E 22.07.2013E
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2949335T 03.02.2017T
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RS55607 30.06.2017B1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG10201405806S 27.11.2014A
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SK501352015U 03.07.2017U1
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI477273B 21.03.2015B
TW201119645 16.06.2011A
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI643614B 11.12.2018B
TW201521718 16.06.2015A
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201733575 01.10.2017A
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
UA103699 11.11.2013C2
Priority number Date
US27468709 20.08.2009
US33761210 11.02.2010
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2405749
 EP2630962