blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2949335

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GBLapse: 21.11.2017
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NLLapse: 04.01.2017
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Examination procedure06.12.2016Observations by third parties
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted04.01.2017
Opposition procedure13.05.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Appeal following opposition04.07.2019APPEAL FILED
05.04.2019APPEAL FILED
02.04.2019APPEAL FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.12.2015 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2630962
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:02.12.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME RS
 
Event date:02.12.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:02.12.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20150608
 
Event date:02.12.2015 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2405749
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:20.01.2016 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20151222
 
Event date:24.02.2016 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20160121
 
Event date:26.10.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 38/16 20060101ALI20160916BHEP
 
Event date:26.10.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 38/02 20060101AFI20160916BHEP
 
Event date:26.10.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 38/07 20060101ALI20160916BHEP
 
Event date:26.10.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/785 20060101ALI20160916BHEP
 
Event date:26.10.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 25/28 20060101ALI20160916BHEP
 
Event date:26.10.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 9/00 20060101ALI20160916BHEP
 
Event date:23.11.2016 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20161027
 
Event date:04.01.2017 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2630962
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:04.01.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:04.01.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME RS
 
Event date:04.01.2017 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2405749
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:04.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:09.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:13.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 858588 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20170115
 
Event date:25.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:BUGNION S.A., CH
 
Event date:03.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R088 602010039443 DE
Code Expl.: EXCLUSIVE LICENCE REGISTERED
 
Event date:03.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 2949335 PT 20170203 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20170120
 
Event date:10.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1218250 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:15.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PLI
Code Expl.: LICENCE
Free Format Text:EXCLUSIVE LICENCE
Name of Requester:TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., IL
 
Event date:20.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO LIS
Code Expl.: PUBLISHED LICENCE
Free Format Text:EXCLUSIVE LICENSE
Name of Requester:TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, P O BOX 1142,
 
Event date:21.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:23.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602010039443 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:10.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES GD2A
Code Expl.: CONTRACTUAL LICENCES
Effective DATE:20170310
 
Event date:16.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU QB
Code Expl.: LICENCE REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20170208
 
Event date:17.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CL
Code Expl.: CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES
Name of Requester:TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., IL
Effective DATE:20170207
 
Event date:20.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY
Effective DATE:20170104
 
Event date:05.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170309 AND 20170315
 
Event date:17.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E013297 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20170123
 
Event date:17.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE QB4A E013297 EE
Code Expl.:+LICENCE REGISTERED
Free Format Text:UNLIMITED LICENSE
Name of Requester:TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD,
Effective DATE:19871115
 
Event date:10.05.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MP
Code Expl.:-PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)
Effective DATE:20170104
 
Event date:11.05.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2612001 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170511
 
Event date:28.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E031282 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170104
 
Event date:03.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK QB4A SK
Code Expl.: LICENCE CONTRACT REGISTERED OR GRANTED
Free Format Text:EXCLUSIVE LICENCE
Name of Requester:TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., JERUSALEM, IL
Effective DATE:19871115
 
Event date:03.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 23201 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20170726
 
Event date:22.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:8
 
Event date:03.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602010039443 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170822
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:15.11.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:G. L. PHARMA GMBH
Effective DATE:20171004
 
Event date:15.11.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:SYNTHON B.V./GENTHON B.V.
Effective DATE:20171004
 
Event date:15.11.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:HEXAL AG
Effective DATE:20171004
 
Event date:15.11.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:GENERICS (UK) LIMITED (TRADING AS MYLAN)
Effective DATE:20171003
 
Event date:15.11.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ALVOGEN IPCO S.A.R.L.
Effective DATE:20171004
 
Event date:22.11.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:HEXAL AG
Effective DATE:20171004
 
Event date:03.01.2018 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:MYLAN TEORANTA TRADING AS MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL
Effective DATE:20171127
 
Event date:05.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK GR 1218250 HK
Code Expl.:+STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:15.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE HH2A E013297 EE
Code Expl.: CORRECTION OF EP APPLICATION AND TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF A EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Payment DATE:20170808
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:04.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:APPEAL FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL. (HP-2017-000010)
 
Event date:04.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:APPEAL DATED 08 JANUARY 2018 IN RELATION TO HP-2017-000010, PERMISSION TO APPEAL IS REFUSED. THE PATENT IS TO BE REVOKED. (A3/2017/3228)
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY
Effective DATE:20171121
 
Event date:27.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:9
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Payment DATE:20180723
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20180821
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20180830
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20180921
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20180814
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180823
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20180719
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20180828
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20180828
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180827
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20180827
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20180723
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20180815
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20180823
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20180822
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20180817
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Payment DATE:20180718
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20180724
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20180817
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20180813
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20180806
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20180815
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20180824
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20180823
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Payment DATE:20180830
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20180822
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20180809
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20180723
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20180821
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20180703
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.12.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20180817
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20180803
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Payment DATE:20180723
Year of Fee Payment:09