Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2955712

EP2955712 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2015/51]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / BAE, Jong-Kon
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / BOTZAS, Anthony
1732 Harte Dr.
San Jose, CA California 95124 / US
03 / HAN, Dong-Kyoon
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/51]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/51]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15171341.910.06.2015
[2015/51]
Priority number, dateUS201462010707P11.06.2014         Original published format: US 201462010707 P
KR2014008396204.07.2014         Original published format: KR 20140083962
[2015/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2955712
Date:16.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/02
[2015/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/30]
Former [2015/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN[2015/51]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD[2015/51]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES[2015/51]
Examination procedure15.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
03.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/24]
01.02.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2007024557  (RHO NAM-SEOK [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,13 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0015] , [0031] , [0066] , [0067] , [0084] , [0088] - [0090] - [0093] , [0100] * [I] 4,5,7,11,12,14;
 [XI]US2012120043  (CHO HWA HYUN [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,8,9 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0071] , [0079] - [0081] - [0089] * [I] 3-7,10-14;
 [A]US2005225562  (HIGGINS MICHAEL F [US] ET AL) [A] 3,10 * figures 1, 13-16 * * paragraphs [0053] , [0054] , [0075] , [0076] *