Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2954811

EP2954811 - FLOW MEASUREMENT IN A HOT DRINKS MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR A COFFEE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Melitta Professional Coffee Solutions GmbH & Co. KG
Zechenstrasse 60
32429 Minden / DE
[2018/09]
Former [2015/51]For all designated states
Melitta Professional Coffee Solutions GmbH & Co., KG
Zechenstrasse 60
32429 Minden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BUCHHOLZ, Bernd
Bössel 7
32369 Rahden / DE
02 / OSTERMEIER, Jörg
An der Schmiede 12
31655 Stadthagen / DE
 [2015/51]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2015/51]
Application number, filing date15171593.511.06.2015
[2015/51]
Priority number, dateDE20141010828112.06.2014         Original published format: DE102014108281
[2015/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2954811
Date:16.12.2015
Language:DE
[2015/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2954811
Date:21.03.2018
Language:DE
[2018/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/00, A47J31/40, A47J31/44, A47J31/46
[2015/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/12]
Former [2015/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DURCHFLUSSMESSUNG IN EINEM HEISSGETRÄNKEAUTOMATEN, INSBESONDERE EINEM KAFFEEVOLLAUTOMATEN[2015/51]
English:FLOW MEASUREMENT IN A HOT DRINKS MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR A COFFEE MACHINE[2015/51]
French:MESURE DE DEBIT DANS UN AUTOMATE DE BOISSONS CHAUDES, EN PARTICULIER UNE MACHINE A CAFE TOTALEMENT AUTOMATIQUE[2015/51]
Examination procedure11.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/12]
15.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2018Fee for grant paid
09.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SI21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE11.06.2018
LU11.06.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE11.06.2018
LU11.06.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/19]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE11.06.2018
LU11.06.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
LU11.06.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/43]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
NO21.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102009016506  (MELITTA SYSTEM SERVICE GMBH & [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0050]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2012240784  (YANG DANIEL [TW]) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025]; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE202008016400U  (EUGSTER FRISMAG AG [CH]) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 *