Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2937365

EP2937365 - METHOD OF MAKING HYDROXYARYL FUNCTIONALIZED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2016
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.10.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2016/50]
Former [2015/44]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Qin, Zengquan
c/o Bridgestone Americas Center for Research and
Technology
1655 South Main Street
Akron, OH Ohio 44301 / US
02 / Yan, Yuan-Yong
c/o Bridgestone Americas Center for Research and
Technology
1655 South Main Street
Akron, OH Ohio 44301 / US
03 / Pan, Xiao-Dong
c/o Bridgestone Americas Center for Research and
Technology
1655 South Main Street
Akron, OH Ohio 44301 / US
04 / Brumbaugh, Dennis R.
c/o Bridgestone Americas Center for Research and
Technology
1655 South Main Street
Akron, OH Ohio 44301 / US
05 / Poulton, Jason
c/o Bridgestone Americas Center for Research and
Technology
1655 South Main Street
Akron, OH Ohio 44301 / US
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15172206.328.12.2008
[2015/44]
Priority number, dateUS20070017278P28.12.2007         Original published format: US 17278 P
US20080127586P14.05.2008         Original published format: US 127586 P
US20080082181P18.07.2008         Original published format: US 82181 P
US20080110107P31.10.2008         Original published format: US 110107 P
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2937365
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2937365
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:C08C19/44, C08F297/02
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/22]
Former [2015/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG FUNKTIONALISIERTER HYDROXYARYLPOLYMERE[2015/44]
English:METHOD OF MAKING HYDROXYARYL FUNCTIONALIZED POLYMERS[2015/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DES POLYMÈRES FONCTIONNALISÉS HYDROXYARYLES[2015/44]
Examination procedure26.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/22]
27.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.10.2016Fee for grant paid
27.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.11.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
08.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08868737.1  / EP2231719
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.12.2008
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CY14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
TR14.12.2016
IE28.12.2016
LU28.12.2016
MT28.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]HU28.12.2008
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CY14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
IE28.12.2016
LU28.12.2016
MT28.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/30]HU28.12.2008
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CY14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
IE28.12.2016
LU28.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/14]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
IE28.12.2016
LU28.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/51]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
IE28.12.2016
LU28.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/49]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
IE28.12.2016
LU28.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/42]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/37]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV14.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0442068  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * examples 13,14; claim - *;
 [A]US5081191  (QUIRK RODERIC P [US]) [A] 1-14 * example 2 *
by applicantUS6242522
 US6489389
 US6734235
 US6476110
 US5066702
 US2004242750
 US6972307
 US6852785
 US4255296
 US4468496
 US2008161467
 US4908404
 US7153919
 US5153159
 US5567815
 US5574109
 US4429091
 US6699813
 US3109871
 US4647625
 US4677153
 US5109907
 US6977281
 US3873489
 US3978103
 US3997581
 US4002594
 US5580919
 US5583245
 US5663396
 US5684171
 US5684172
 US5696197
 US6525118
    - The Vanderbilt Rubber Handbook, (1990), pages 603 - 04
    - H. MOURI ET AL., "Improved Tire Wet Traction Through the Use of Mineral Fillers", RUBBER CHEM. AND TECH., (1999), vol. 72, pages 960 - 68
    - WESTWOOD ET AL., "Simplified Polymer Mimics of Cross-Linking Adhesive Proteins", MACROMOLECULES, (2007), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1021/ma0703002, pages 3960 - 64, XP002541456

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma0703002
    - BRUNAUER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 60, page 309
    - KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chem. Tech., WILEY INTERSCIENCE, (1982), vol. 20, pages 365 - 468
    - J.J. BRENNAN ET AL., RUBBER CHEM. AND TECH., (1967), vol. 40, page 817