Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3067885

EP3067885 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ENCODING OR DECODING A MULTI-CHANNEL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.09.2017  [2017/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[2016/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Dick, Sascha
Schupferstraße 49
90482 Nürnberg / DE
02 / Schuh, Florian
Eichenwaldstr. 9
90513 Zirndorf / DE
03 / Rettelbach, Nikolaus
Spessartstr. 38
90427 Nürnberg / DE
04 / Schwegler, Tobias
Amalienstr. 35
90419 Nürnberg / DE
05 / Füg, Richard
Kirchenweg 26
90419 Nürnberg / DE
06 / Hilpert, Johannes
Ziegelsteinstr. 183
90411 Nürnberg / DE
07 / Neusinger, Matthias
Bergstr. 10
91189 Rohr / DE
 [2016/37]
Representative(s)Zinkler, Franz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[2016/37]
Application number, filing date15172492.917.06.2015
[2016/37]
Priority number, dateEP2015015823409.03.2015         Original published format: EP 15158234
[2016/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3067885
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G10L19/008
[2016/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSCHLÜSSELUNG ODER ENTSCHLÜSSELUNG EINES MEHRKANALSIGNALS[2016/37]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ENCODING OR DECODING A MULTI-CHANNEL SIGNAL[2016/37]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE CODAGE OU LE DÉCODAGE D'UN SIGNAL MULTICANAL[2016/37]
Examination procedure15.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/37]
26.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2013077793  (MOON HAN-GIL [KR], et al) [X] 1-8,11-17,19,20,22-27 * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] - [0043] , [0099] , [0111] * [A] 9,10,18,21;
 [A]US2004049379  (THUMPUDI NAVEEN [US], et al) [A] 9,10,18,21 * paragraphs [0228] , [0231]; figure 16 *;
 [A]US2009112606  (MEHROTRA SANJEEV [US], et al) [A] 3,17 * paragraphs [0118] , [0130] , [0131] *
by applicant   - YANG, DAI; AI, HONGMEI; KYRIAKAKIS, CHRIS; KUO, C.-C. JAY, ADAPTIVE KARHUNEN-LOEVE TRANSFORM FOR ENHANCED MULTICHANNEL AUDIO CODING, (2001), URL: http://ict.usc.edu/pubs/Adaptive%20Karhunen-Loeve%20Transform%20for%20Enhanced %20Multichannel%20Audio%20Codin.pdf