EP2957186 - VENTILATED SHOE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geox S.p.A. Via Feltrina Centro, 16 31044 Montebelluna, Frazione Biadene / IT | [2019/51] |
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states Geox S.p.A. Via Feltrina Centro, 16 31044 Montebelluna Località Biadene (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLEGATO MORETTI, Mario Via Fantin, 96 31035 Crocetta del Montello (TV) / IT | 02 /
POLONI, Livio VIA Montegrappa, 210 31031 Caerano di San Marco (TV) / IT | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2020/19] |
Former [2015/52] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15172567.8 | 17.06.2015 | [2015/52] | Priority number, date | IT2014PD00148 | 17.06.2014 Original published format: IT PD20140148 | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2957186 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2957186 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/12, A43B23/02, A43B23/07, A43B7/08 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
A43B23/022 (EP,EA,US);
A43B23/0245 (CN,EA);
A43B3/00 (CN,EA);
A43B13/14 (CN,EA);
A43B13/386 (EA,US);
A43B23/026 (EA,US);
A43B23/07 (EP,EA,US);
A43B7/082 (EA,US);
A43B7/085 (EP,EA,US);
A43B7/087 (EP,CN,EA,US);
A43B7/125 (EP,EA,US);
D04B21/16 (EP,EA,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2015/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 08.06.2016 | ME | 08.06.2016 | Validation states | MA | 08.06.2016 | Title | German: | BELÜFTETER SCHUH | [2015/52] | English: | VENTILATED SHOE | [2015/52] | French: | CHAUSSURE VENTILÉE | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 26.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | LU | 17.06.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4073072 (GROSS ALEXANDER LOUIS, et al) [X] 1-6,9-11 * column 1 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-4 * [I] 7,8,12-15; | [XDI]US5746013 (FAY SR WILLIAM L [US]) [XD] 1-5,9,11,12,14 * the whole document * [I] 6-8,10,13,15; | [XI]EP1723863 (USS SAFETY SYSTEM S P A [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,11 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-8 * [I] 3,7,8,10,12-14; | [A]WO2007107264 (GEOX SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-6,9-14 * the whole document *; | [A]KR101347130B (ECOGREENPIA CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-4,7,9,11-15* abstract * | by applicant | US5746013 | JP19930089939 | EP20090425334 |