Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2962652

EP2962652 - TRANSVERSE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer Spine, Inc.
7375 Bush Lake Road
Edina MN 55439 / US
[2016/01]
Inventor(s)01 / DANT, Jack A.
c/o Zimmer Spine, Inc.
7375 Bush Lake Road
Minneapolis, MN Minnesota 55439 / US
02 / HOCH, Deborah L.
c/o Zimmer Spine, Inc.
7375 Bush Lake Road
Minneapolis, MN Minnesota 55439 / US
03 / JERKE, Eric P.
c/o Zimmer Spine, Inc.
7375 Bush Lake Road
Minneapolis, MN Minnesota 55439 / US
04 / LUNDEQUAM, Eric J.
c/o Zimmer Spine, Inc.
7375 Bush Lake Road
Minneapolis, MN Minnesota 55439 / US
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/01]
Application number, filing date15173938.025.06.2015
[2016/01]
Priority number, dateUS20141431572226.06.2014         Original published format: US201414315722
[2016/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2962652
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2962652
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[2016/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
Former [2016/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:QUERSTECKER[2016/01]
English:TRANSVERSE CONNECTOR[2016/01]
French:CONNECTEUR TRANSVERSAL[2016/01]
Examination procedure06.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/33]
27.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2017Fee for grant paid
06.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.06.2015
AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
LU25.06.2017
MT25.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
LU25.06.2017
MT25.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
LU25.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/25]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
LU25.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
LU25.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL12.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006052783  (DANT JACK A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038]; figures 5-7 * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049]; figures 10, 11 * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063]; figure 15 *;
 [A]US2012150230  (FELIX BRENT A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0836836  (SPINAL INNOVATIONS [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2012016425  (SHAFFREY CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 93, 94 *