Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3112101

EP3112101 - A DISPOSABLE FLUID DISPENSING HAIR REMOVAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019New entry: Receipt of request for further processing 
02.10.2019New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2017/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Hodgson, Matthew James
460 Basingstoke Road
Reading, Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB
02 / Shorey, Anthony William
460 Basingstoke Road
Reading, Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB
03 / Caton, Nicola Louise
460 Basingstoke Road
Reading, Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB
 [2017/01]
Representative(s)Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/01]Kohol, Sonia
Technical Centres Limited
Procter & Gamble Patent Department
Rusham Park
Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Application number, filing date15174581.730.06.2015
[2017/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3112101
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/44
[2017/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/33]
Former [2017/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:WEGWERFBARE FLÜSSIGKEITSABGEBENDE HAARENTFERNUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2017/01]
English:A DISPOSABLE FLUID DISPENSING HAIR REMOVAL DEVICE[2017/01]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉPILATION AVEC DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE JETABLE[2017/01]
Examination procedure30.06.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/33]
11.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.09.2019Request for further processing filed
30.09.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2300512  (LANDAU JOSEPH N) [X] 1-9,11,14 * column 2, line 2 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-6 * [Y] 1,2,10,12,13 [I] 15;
 [Y]DE1807236  (THERY GEORGES EMILE) [Y] 10 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1, 2, 4 *;
 [Y]US4977669  (CLIFFORD RONALD E [US]) [Y] 12 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 35; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]WO2012058216  (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [Y] 13 * page 4, lines 12-31; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5014427  (BYRNE JAMES C [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 4, lines 1-8; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4625402  (KAVOUSSI JAMES P [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 34-42; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5564190  (FLEETWOOD DAVID P [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 15; figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]WO2009019521  (URECZKY DANIEL [HU]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, paragraph 4; figure 9 *;
 [A]US4314404  (RUIZ RENE A, et al) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 31; figures 1-5 *
by applicantUS2013145626
 US2013145625
 US2013145601
 WO2011130372
 EP0427889
 DE102011117590
 US2004016126
 US20060367918