blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2966358

EP2966358 - FIRING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.06.2024
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.03.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 17.07.2024  [2024/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bicker, Leopold
Felderstraße 27
3370 Ybbs / AT
[2016/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2016/02]
Representative(s)Müllner, Martin, et al
Patentanwälte
Martin Müllner, Markus Speringer
Postfach 169
Weihburggasse 9
1010 Wien / AT
[2024/29]
Former [2016/02]Müllner, Martin, et al
Patentanwalt
Weihburggasse 9
Postfach 159
1014 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date15175043.702.07.2015
[2016/02]
Priority number, dateAT2014005047104.07.2014         Original published format: AT 504712014
[2016/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2966358
Date:13.01.2016
Language:DE
[2016/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2966358
Date:21.09.2016
Language:DE
[2016/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2966358
Date:17.07.2024
Language:DE
[2024/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2016
ClassificationIPC:F24B5/02, F23L9/02, F23L9/06, F23B90/04, F23B80/04
[2016/02]
CPC:
F23L9/02 (EP); F24B5/023 (AT); F23B80/04 (EP);
F23B90/04 (EP); F23L9/06 (EP); F24B5/021 (AT);
F24B5/025 (AT); F24B5/026 (EP,AT) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/15]
Former [2016/02]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:FEUERUNGSEINRICHTUNG[2016/02]
English:FIRING DEVICE[2016/02]
French:INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFE[2016/02]
Examination procedure02.07.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/15]
18.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.2020Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.07.2020Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
02.02.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2024Fee for grant paid
24.05.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.05.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination23.09.2020Appeal received No.  T2028/20
20.11.2020Statement of grounds filed
05.12.2023Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
22.12.2023Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
05.12.2023Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
21.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
06.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
07.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
10.06.2024Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]CH240716  (VON WARTBURG WILHELM [CH]);
 [A]DE1760311U  (LANGE RIO [DE]);
 [A]IT1173858  (TELEC 2000 SRL SOC [FR]);
 [XAI]DE20011685U  (BERGHOLZ GUENTER [DE])
by applicantDE3927378
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.