EP3111959 - RADIOTHERAPEUTIC PARTICLES AND SUSPENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oncoinvent AS Gullhaugveien 7 0484 Oslo / NO | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states Oncoinvent AS Kjelsåsveien 168B 0884 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westrøm, Sara Leiv Eirikssons gate 7 N-0271 Oslo / NO | 02 /
Larsen, Roy Hartvig Lunden 20 N-0598 Oslo / NO | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | Application number, filing date | 15175318.3 | 03.07.2015 | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111959 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3111959 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/02, A61K51/10, A61K51/12, A61P35/00, // A61K103/00 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
A61K51/02 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61K51/025 (KR,US);
A61K51/1093 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K51/10 (RU);
A61K51/103 (EP,CN,US);
A61K51/12 (RU);
A61K51/1244 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (CN);
A61K9/10 (CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C01F11/18 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | RADIOTHERAPEUTISCHE PARTIKEL UND SUSPENSIONEN | [2017/01] | English: | RADIOTHERAPEUTIC PARTICLES AND SUSPENSIONS | [2017/01] | French: | PARTICULES ET SUSPENSIONS RADIOTHÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2017/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2015 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 03.07.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.09.2017 | CY | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MK | 13.09.2017 | SM | 13.09.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 13.09.2017 | |
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | EE | 13.09.2017 | |
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | EE | 13.09.2017 | |
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/15] | HR | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | HR | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9951278 (DU PONT PHARM CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 2 * * page 10, lines 30-35 ** example 3 *; | [XY]EP1812115 (ALGETA AS [NO], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] - [0043] - [0046] - [0057] , [0065] - [0070] - [0085] - [0087] * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-14 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]WO2012131378 (ALGETA ASA [NO], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-12,14,15 * page 5, lines 11-17 * * page 6, lines 18-21, 25-27 * * page 8, lines 11-26 * * page 11, line 25 - page 12, line 24 * * page 14, lines 4-6, 23-25 * * page 16, line 16 - page 17, line 10 * * examples 1-7 * [Y] 1-15; | [X] - MARIO VOLTAGGIO ET AL, "Implantation of recoiling radionuclides of U and Th radioactive series applied to estimation of sur cial erosion of CaCO 3 materials", APPLIED GEOCHEMISTRY, (20010601), vol. 16, pages 835 - 848, XP055234427 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [XY] - VERGOTE I ET AL, "Therapeutic efficacy of the alpha-emitter <211>At bound on microspheres compared with <90>Y and <32>P colloids in a murine intraperitoneal tumor model", GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 47, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0090-8258(92)90141-5, ISSN 0090-8258, (19921201), pages 366 - 372, (19921201), XP026232121 [X] 1,2,4,6-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0090-8258(92)90141-5 | by applicant | US4970062 | US8142758 | - BLOOMER, W.D.; MCLAUGHLIN, W.H.; NEIRINCKX, R.D.; ADELSTEIN, S.J.; GORDON, P.R.; RUTH, T.J.; WOLF, A.P., "Astatine-211-tellurium radiocolloid cures experimental malignant ascites", SCIENCE, (1981), vol. 212, pages 340 - 341 | - BOUDOUSQ V1; BOBYK L; BUSSON M; GARAMBOIS V; JARLIER M; CHARALAMBATOU P; PELEGRIN A; PAILLAS S; CHOUIN N; QUENET F, "Comparison between internalizing anti-HER2 mAbs and non-internalizing anti-CEA mAbs in alpha-radioimmunotherapy of small volume peritoneal carcinomatosis using 212Pb", PLOS ONE, (20130729), vol. 8, no. 7 | - GUSTAFSSON AM1; BACK T; ELGQVIST J; JACOBSSON L; HULTBORN R; ALBERTSSON P; MORGENSTERN A; BRUCHERTSEIFER F; JENSEN H; LINDEGREN S, "Comparison of therapeutic efficacy and biodistribution of 213Bi- and 211At-labeled monoclonal antibody MX35 in an ovarian cancer model", NUCL MED BIOL., (201201), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 15 - 22 | - KIRBY, H. W; SALUTSKY, MURRELL L, The Radiochemistry of Radium (PDF, NATIONAL ACADEMIES PRESS, (1964), page 5 | - LIU S., "Bifunctional coupling agents for radiolabeling of biomolecules and target specific delivery of metallic radionuclides", ADV DRUG DELIV REV., (2008), vol. 60, no. 12, pages 1347 - 1370 | - RITTER MA; CLEAVER JE; TOBIAS CA, "High-LET radiations induce a large proportion of non-rejoining DNA breaks", NATURE, (19770414), vol. 266, no. 5603, pages 653 - 5 | - OTT A. GERBER; VIKTORIYA Y. RYBALKO; CHAD E. BIGELOW; T AMIT A. LUGADE; THOMAS H. FOSTER; JOHN G. FRELINGER; EDITH M. LORD, "Preferential Attachment of Peritoneal Tumor Metastases to Omental Immune Aggregates and Possible Role of a Unique Vascular Microenvironment in Metastatic Survival and Growth", AM J PATHOL., (200611), vol. 169, no. 5, pages 1739 - 1752 | - VERGOTE I; LARSEN RH; DE VOS L; NESLAND JM; BRULAND 0; BJORGUM J; ALSTAD J; TROPE C; NUSTAD K, "Therapeutic efficacy of the alpha-emitter 211At bound on microspheres compared with 90Y and 32P colloids in a murine intraperitoneal tumor model", GYNECOL ONCOL., (199212), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 366 - 72 |