Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2977919

EP2977919 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.02.2020 [2020/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2016/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Miyamoto, Daijiro
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Tamura, Makiya
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Kato, Natsuki
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2016/04]
Representative(s)Williamson, Brian , et al
Canon Europe Limited
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/09]Williamson, Brian , et al
Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
Former [2016/04]Walker, Philip Martin
Canon Europe Ltd
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
Application number, filing date15175320.903.07.2015
[2016/04]
Priority number, dateJP2014013814203.07.2014         Original published format: JP 2014138142
[2016/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2977919
Date:27.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2977919
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2016/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/36]
Former [2016/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON UND SPEICHERMEDIUM[2016/04]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME, AND STORAGE MEDIUM[2016/04]
French:APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE[2016/04]
Examination procedure16.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/36]
30.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2019Fee for grant paid
11.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)28.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL27.02.2019
AT27.02.2019
CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
PL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/52]AL27.02.2019
CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
PL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/51]AL27.02.2019
CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL27.02.2019
CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
RS27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006242591  (VAN DOK CORNELIS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0116] * * figure 4 *;
 [Y]EP2568696  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0111] * * figure 6 *;
 [Y]US2003105589  (LIU WEN-YIN [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0074] *;
 [A]US2004230966  (MORRIS ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * figure 2 *
by applicantJP2008072256