Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2946797

EP2946797 - SINGLE COLLECTION BAG BLOOD COLLECTION SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.01.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fenwal, Inc.
Three Corporate Drive
Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US
[2015/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Payrat, Jean-Marc
Rue Maubille, 12A
1401 Baulers / BE
02 / Hugard, Serge
Rue Pont-a-la-Cambe, 67
1370 Jodoigne-Souveraine / BE
03 / Stonig, Christian
Josef Kraft Gasse 4/2
2115 Ernstbrunn N / AT
04 / Erasmus, Boudewijn
St. Wilibrordusstraat 4
3768 CP Soest / NL
05 / Mignon, Emmanuel
Rue de Wand 3
1020 Brussels / BE
06 / Gassman, Christopher D.
6801 Huntley Road
Crystal Lake, IL Illinois 60014 / US
07 / Little, Clay
2870 Farmington Drive
Lindenhurst, IL Illinois 60046 / US
08 / Blickhan, Bryan
520 Hemlock Lane
Libertyville, IL Illinois 60048 / US
 [2015/48]
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2015/48]
Application number, filing date15175794.510.04.2012
[2015/48]
Priority number, dateUS201161476955P19.04.2011         Original published format: US 201161476955 P
[2015/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2946797
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2946797
Date:07.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/02
[2015/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/26]
Former [2015/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BLUTSAMMELSYSTEM MIT EINFACHEM SAMMELBEUTEL, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG[2015/48]
English:SINGLE COLLECTION BAG BLOOD COLLECTION SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS[2015/48]
French:SYSTÈME PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRÉLÈVEMENT SANGUIN À SAC DE PRÉLÈVEMENT UNIQUE[2015/48]
Examination procedure19.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/26]
12.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2017Fee for grant paid
01.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12163633.6  / EP2514446
Opposition(s)08.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/25]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
DK07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
IT07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE07.06.2017
ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/52]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
NL07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SE07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2004058046  (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 1,3 * page 28, paragraph 134 - page 29, paragraph 135 * * page 31, paragraph 139 * * page 35, paragraph 149 - page 36, paragraph 149 * * page 110, paragraph 271 - page 113, paragraph 276 * * page 115, paragraph 279 - paragraph 280 * * page 121, paragraph 289 - page 122, paragraph 290 * * page 129, paragraph 303 - page 130, paragraph 303 * * figures 2,6,39-42,43-47,51,62,68 * [I] 2,6-12,14;
 [A]US2009211989  (NGUYEN LAN T [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11 * page 49, paragraph 616 - page 50, paragraph 620 * * figures 47,48,64A-64C *;
 [A]US2009239208  (MAYAUDON VERONIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1,11 * page 3, paragraph 37 * * figure 10 *;
 [A]US5445629  (DEBRAUWERE JACK [BE], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 4, line 4 - line 66 * * column 5, line 36 - line 47 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2001037078  (LYNN DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * page 7, paragraph 103 - paragraph 112 * * figure 12 *
by applicantUS6994790
 US4443215
 US20100888962