Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3116080

EP3116080 - A HIGH EFFICIENCY LIMITER CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.04.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.04.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
02.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2017/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Kirisken, Barbaros
c/o Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bolgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / Yatir, Mustafa
c/o Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bolgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2017/02]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2017/02]
Application number, filing date15175820.808.07.2015
[2017/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3116080
Date:11.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02H7/12, H02M1/00, H02H9/00
[2017/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/19]
Former [2017/02]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHEFFIZIENTE BEGRENZERSCHALTUNG[2017/02]
English:A HIGH EFFICIENCY LIMITER CIRCUIT[2017/02]
French:CIRCUIT LIMITEUR À HAUTE EFFICACITÉ[2017/02]
Examination procedure08.07.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/19]
05.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002191359  (CHEN CHIN-HOU [TW]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0005] , [0016] , [0017]; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]EP2586898  (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0004] - [0009]; figure 1 *;
 [A]CN104578093  (JIANGSU NICETOWN ELECTRIC POWER AUTOMATION CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantGB1132476
 US2264746