Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2958376

EP2958376 - MULTI-CARRIER OPERATION FOR WIRELESS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2015/52]
Inventor(s)01 / YU, Dong-Sheng
31 Westpointe Crescent
Ottawa, Ontario K2G 5Y9 / CA
02 / NIKOPOURDEILAMI, Hosein
236 Kohilo Cres.
Ottawa, Ontario K2S 0E6 / CA
03 / FONG, Mo-Han
95 Beech Street
Apt 205
Ottawa, Ontario K1S 3J7 / CA
 [2015/52]
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2015/52]Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15176742.302.09.2010
[2015/52]
Priority number, dateUS20090239204P02.09.2009         Original published format: US 239204 P
[2015/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2958376
Date:23.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/18, H04W56/00
[2015/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/31]
Former [2015/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:MEHRTRÄGERBETRIEB FÜR DRAHTLOSE SYSTEME[2015/52]
English:MULTI-CARRIER OPERATION FOR WIRELESS SYSTEMS[2015/52]
French:FONCTIONNEMENT À PORTEUSES MULTIPLES POUR DES SYSTÈMES SANS FIL[2015/52]
Examination procedure22.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/31]
09.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10813197.0  / EP2474186
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
15.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2006125149  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0036] * * figure 3 *;
 [Y]  - "Proposed Changes/Refinements to the Sections 4-9, 13, 14, and 17 of IEEE 802.16m SDD ; C80216m-09_1196", IEEE DRAFT; C80216M-09_1196, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20090703), vol. 802.16m, pages 1 - 52, XP017612173 [Y] 1-15 * page 11, paragraph 6.3 - page 12, paragraph 6.3.2 * * page 16, paragraph 8.1 * * page 38, paragraph 17.1 - page 52, paragraph 17.4.9.1 * * figures 7, 30 *
 [A]  - "Comments on the Multi-Carrier DG Harmonized Text Proposal - MAC (1283) ; C80216m-09_1619", IEEE DRAFT; C80216M-09_1619, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20090712), vol. 802.16m, pages 1 - 15, XP017612382 [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 15.2.9 - page 7, paragraph 15.2.9.2.3.2.2 * * page 12, paragraph 15.2.9.10 - paragraph 15.2.9.10.1 *
 [A]  - YIH-SHEN CHEN ET AL, "Secondary Carrier Wake-up in Multicarrier Sleep Mode Operation (15.2.7.2.10.1) ; C80216m-09_1897r1", IEEE DRAFT; C80216M-09_1897R1, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20090829), vol. 802.16m, no. r1, pages 1 - 8, XP068002118 [A] 1,9 * pages 2,5,6,8 *
 [A]  - YIH-SHEN CHEN ET AL, "Traffic Indication for Multi-Carrier Sleep Mode Operations (AWD-MCDG) ; C80216m-09_1496r1", IEEE DRAFT; C80216M-09_1496R1, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20090706), vol. 802.16m, no. r1, pages 1 - 4, XP017798384 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *