blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3118576 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3118576



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 229
17.07.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.09.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
17.08.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.06.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.06.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.06.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.06.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.06.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
05.06.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 26
31.05.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
09.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
09.05.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
09.05.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
09.05.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
09.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.05.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
01.02.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.02.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.02.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.02.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 26
30.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
30.08.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
30.08.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
30.08.2017 Description Search / examination 2
30.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.08.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.07.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
20.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.07.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.04.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
12.04.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.04.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.01.2017 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
21.12.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
14.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
14.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 4
08.01.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
08.01.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
15.07.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
15.07.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
15.07.2015 Description Search / examination 28
15.07.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Drawings Search / examination 6
15.07.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5