blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3118576


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
19.07.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
31.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.07.2019  [2019/27]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
10.08.2018 (Expected) grant published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
01.08.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.06.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.06.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.05.2018 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.05.2018 Deletion: Payment of fee for grant
15.05.2018 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.05.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.05.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.05.2018 Change - divisional application(s) published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
31.01.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.09.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.07.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.04.2017 First examination report
16.12.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
16.12.2016 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
16.12.2016 Request for examination filed published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
26.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
25.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
17.07.2015 Change - representative