blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3118576 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201610557618 EP15176943 EP18171435



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3396313Global Dossier 31.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP15176943 15.07.2015
EP18171435 15.07.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106352804Global Dossier 25.01.2017A
Priority number Date
EP15176943 15.07.2015
US201615146084 04.05.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10393506Global Dossier 27.08.2019B2
US2017016714 19.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP15176943 15.07.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3118576Global Dossier 12.09.2018B1
EP3118576 18.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP15176943 15.07.2015
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3396313