Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3118576

EP3118576 - MOBILE DIMENSIONING DEVICE WITH DYNAMIC ACCURACY COMPATIBLE WITH NIST STANDARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hand Held Products, Inc.
9680 Old Bailes Road
Fort Mill, SC 29707 / US
[2017/03]
Inventor(s)01 / LAFFARGUE, Franck
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Patent Services M/S AB/2B
P.O. Box 2245
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
02 / MCCLOSKEY, Scott
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Patent Services M/S AB/2B
P.O. Box 2245
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
03 / ACKLEY, H. Sprague
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Patent Services M/S AB/2B
P.O. Box 2245
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
 [2017/03]
Representative(s)Houghton, Mark Phillip
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street
Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[2017/03]
Application number, filing date15176943.715.07.2015
[2017/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3118576
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3118576
Date:12.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01B21/04, G01B11/02
[2017/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/03]
TitleGerman:MOBILE DIMENSIONIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT DYNAMISCHER NIST-STANDARDKONFORMER GENAUIGKEIT[2017/03]
English:MOBILE DIMENSIONING DEVICE WITH DYNAMIC ACCURACY COMPATIBLE WITH NIST STANDARD[2017/03]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DIMENSIONNEMENT MOBILE AVEC PRÉCISION DYNAMIQUE COMPATIBLE AVEC UNE NORME NIST[2017/03]
Examination procedure15.07.2015Examination requested  [2017/03]
15.07.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.05.2018Fee for grant paid
09.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18171435.3  / EP3396313
Opposition(s)13.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
[2019/37]
Former [2019/34]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
NO12.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT12.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[IAY]EP2533009  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [I] 1,3-13 * paragraphs [0012] - [0020]; figures 1-3,5 * [A] 14,15 [Y] 2;
 [YD]US2014049635  (LAFFARGUE FRANCK [FR] ET AL) [YD] 2 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0080]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0085] - [0093]; figure 5 *;
 [A]EP1443312  (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0032]; figures 1-9 *
by applicantUS6832725
 US7128266
 US7159783
 US7413127
 US7726575
 US8294969
 US8317105
 US8322622
 US8366005
 US8371507
 US8376233
 US8381979
 US8390909
 US8408464
 US8408468
 US8408469
 US8424768
 US8448863
 US8457013
 US8459557
 US8463079
 US8469272
 US8474712
 US8479992
 US8490877
 US8517271
 US8523076
 US8528818
 US8544737
 US8548242
 US8548420
 US8550335
 US8550354
 US8550357
 US8556174
 US8556176
 US8556177
 US8559767
 US8599957
 US8561895
 US8561903
 US8561905
 US8565107
 US8571307
 US8579200
 US8583924
 US8584945
 US8587595
 US8587697
 US8588869
 US8590789
 US8596539
 US8596542
 US8596543
 US8599271
 US8600158
 US8600167
 US8602309
 US8608053
 US8608071
 US8611309
 US8615487
 US8616454
 US8621123
 US8622303
 US8628013
 US8628015
 US8628016
 US8629926
 US8630491
 US8635309
 US8636200
 US8636212
 US8636215
 US8636224
 US8638806
 US8640958
 US8640960
 US8643717
 US8646692
 US8646694
 US8657200
 US8659397
 US8668149
 US8678285
 US8678286
 US8682077
 US8687282
 US8692927
 US8695880
 US8698949
 US8717494
 US8720783
 US8723804
 US8723904
 US8727223
 USD702237S
 US8740082
 US8740085
 US8746563
 US8750445
 US8752766
 US8756059
 US8757495
 US8760563
 US8763909
 US8777108
 US8777109
 US8779898
 US8781520
 US8783573
 US8789757
 US8789758
 US8789759
 US8794520
 US8794522
 US8794526
 US8798367
 US8807431
 US8807432
 US8820630
 US8854633
 US2013163789
 US2013173985
 US2014019130
 US2014110495
 US2008185432
 US2009134221
 US2010177080
 US2010177076
 US2010177707
 US2010177749
 US2010202702
 US2010220894
 US2011202554
 US2012111946
 US2012138685
 US2012168511
 US2012168512
 US2012193423
 US2012203647
 US2012223141
 US2012228382
 US2012248188
 US2013043312
 US2013056285
 US2013070322
 US2013075168
 US2013082104
 US2013175341
 US2013175343
 US2013200158
 US2013256418
 US2013257744
 US2013257759
 US2013270346
 US2013278425
 US2013287258
 US2013292475
 US2013292477
 US2013293539
 US2013293540
 US2013306728
 US2013306730
 US2013306731
 US2013307964
 US2013308625
 US2013313324
 US2013313325
 US2013341399
 US2013342717
 US2014001267
 US2014002828
 US2014008430
 US2014008439
 US2014025584
 US2014027518
 US2014034734
 US2014036848
 US2014039693
 US2014042814
 US2014049120
 US2014049635
 US2014061305
 US2014061306
 US2014063289
 US2014066136
 US2014067692
 US2014070005
 US2014071840
 US2014074746
 US2014075846
 US2014076974
 US2014078341
 US2014078342
 US2014078345
 US2014084068
 US2014097249
 US2014098792
 US2014100774
 US2014100813
 US2014103115
 US2014104413
 US2014104414
 US2014104416
 US2014104451
 US2014106594
 US2014106725
 US2014108010
 US2014108402
 US2014108682
 US2014110485
 US2014114530
 US2014124577
 US2014124579
 US2014125842
 US2014125853
 US2014125999
 US2014129378
 US2014131438
 US2014131441
 US2014131443
 US2014131444
 US2014131445
 US2014131448
 US2014133379
 US2014136208
 US2014140585
 US2014151453
 US2014152882
 US2014158770
 US2014159869
 US2014160329
 US2014166755
 US2014166757
 US2014166759
 US2014166760
 US2014166761
 US2014168787
 US2014175165
 US2014175169
 US2014175172
 US2014175174
 US2014191644
 US2014191913
 US2014197238
 US2014197239
 US2014197304
 US2014203087
 US2014204268
 US2014214631
 US2014217166
 US2014217180
 US2014267609