Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2980420 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2980420



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 158
02.03.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.04.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.03.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
14.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
14.03.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.11.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.11.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.11.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.11.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
30.11.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 21
03.11.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.08.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
08.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.07.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
08.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
08.07.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
08.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
08.07.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
08.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
08.02.2016 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
07.01.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.12.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 2
04.12.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
04.12.2015 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.11.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
22.09.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
20.07.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.07.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
20.07.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
20.07.2015 Description Search / examination 12
20.07.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.07.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.07.2015 Drawings Search / examination 7
20.07.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5