Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2980420


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
02.03.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
24.03.2017 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
21.03.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.11.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.07.2016 Amendment by applicant
02.02.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.02.2016  [2016/05]
01.01.2016 Request for examination filed published on  03.02.2016  [2016/05]
20.07.2015 Change - representative