Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2980420

EP2980420 - PANEL-INSERT ASSEMBLY AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2017/17]
Former [2016/05]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEWIS, Michael S.
The Boeing Company
Mail Code 19-HP
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
02 / SAKURAI, Jessica
The Boeing Company
Mail Code 19-HP
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
03 / REEVES, Brad J.
The Boeing Company
Mail Code 19-HP
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
 [2016/05]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/05]Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15177477.520.07.2015
[2016/05]
Priority number, dateUS20141444524229.07.2014         Original published format: US201414445242
[2016/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2980420
Date:03.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2980420
Date:26.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:F16B5/01, B64C1/12
[2016/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/05]
TitleGerman:TAFELEINSATZANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN[2016/05]
English:PANEL-INSERT ASSEMBLY AND METHOD[2016/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET ENSEMBLE PANNEAU-INSERT[2016/05]
Examination procedure20.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/05]
08.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2017Fee for grant paid
14.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.07.2015
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MK26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE20.07.2017
LU20.07.2017
MT20.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU20.07.2015
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE20.07.2017
LU20.07.2017
MT20.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2019/31]HU20.07.2015
AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE20.07.2017
LU20.07.2017
MT20.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2019/30]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE20.07.2017
LU20.07.2017
MT20.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/43]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE20.07.2017
LU20.07.2017
MT20.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE20.07.2017
LU20.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE20.07.2017
LU20.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/23]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE20.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL26.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US3621557  (CUSHMAN KENNETH V, et al) [X] 1,2,7-10 * figures 1-10 *;
 [A]FR2636004  (SHUR LOK INTERNATIONAL SA [BE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1353236  (VSI CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *