Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP3000480

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
NL 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure11.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201510   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2016
31.12.201611   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:30.03.2016 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:30.03.2016 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1971371
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:29.03.2017 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20161001