Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3000480

EP3000480 - CANCER THERAPIES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS USED THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.03.2017  [2017/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ProNAi Therapeutics, Inc.
46701 Commerce Center Drive
Plymouth, MI 48170 / US
[2016/13]
Inventor(s)01 / GOODWIN, Neal, Clifford
120 109TH Avenue
Plainwell MI Michigan 49080 / US
02 / MC GOVREN, James Patrick
c/o ProNAi Therapeutics, Inc.
46701 Commerce Center Drive
Plymouth, Michigan 48170 / US
 [2016/13]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2016/13]
Application number, filing date15177547.501.12.2006
[2016/13]
Priority number, dateUS20050741229P01.12.2005         Original published format: US 741229 P
US20060778304P02.03.2006         Original published format: US 778304 P
[2016/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3000480
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K45/06, A61K31/7088, A61K31/70, A61K31/4745, A61K31/573, A61K31/475, A61K31/337, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61K31/575, C07K16/28
[2016/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/13]
TitleGerman:KREBSTHERAPIEN UND DABEI VERWENDETE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2016/13]
English:CANCER THERAPIES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS USED THEREIN[2016/13]
French:THERAPIES CONTRE LE CANCER ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES UTILISEES DANS CES THERAPIES[2016/13]
Examination procedure01.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/13]
11.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/13]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06838847.9  / EP1971371
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201510   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2016
31.12.201611   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO02092617  (AVI BIOPHARMA INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 15, line 19 - line 23 * * page 5, line 5 - line 32 *;
 [A]WO9814172  (UNIV TEXAS [US]; TORMO MAR [ES]; TARA ANA M [US]; LOPEZ BERESTEIN GABR) [A] 1-15 * page 11, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 12, line 26 - line 27 * * claims *;
 [A]US5792608  (SWAMINATHAN SUNDARAMOORTHI [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * column 24, line 11 - line 15 * * column 27, line 20 - line 23 *;
 [A]WO9508350  (REED JOHN C [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims * * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 13 *;
 [A]WO2004056971  (GENTA INC [US]; WARRELL RAYMOND P [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims * * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph LAST - page 28, paragraph 2 * * page 18, paragraph LAST - page 19, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]WO03072591  (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA]; GLEAVE MARTIN [CA]; RENNIE PAUL S [CA]; MI) [A] 1-15 * page 7, paragraph LAST - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, line 3 - line 15 * * example 4 *;
 [XP]WO2005118824  (PRONAI THERAPEUTICS INC [US]; SHEIKHNEHJAD GHOLAMREZA [US]; SOOCH MINA) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANDERSON ET AL, "Targeted anti-cancer therapy using rituximab, a chimeric anti-CD20 antibody (IDEC-C2B8) in the treatment of non-Hodgkin's B-cell lymphoma", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, COLCHESTER, ESSEX, GB, (1997), vol. 2, no. 25, ISSN 0300-5127, pages 705 - 708, XP002078838 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BENTLEY D L ET AL, "NOVEL PROMOTER UPSTREAM OF THE HUMAN C-MYC GENE AND REGULATION OF C-MYC EXPRESSION IN B CELL LYMPHOMAS", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1986), vol. 6, no. 10, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 3481 - 3489, XP002435327 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5576208
 US5582986
 US5539082
 US5714331
 US5719262
 US5489677
 US5602240
 US5034506
 WO9967378
 US6316612
 US6489465
 WO9914226
 WO0056746
 WO0056748
 WO0066604
 WO0125248
 WO0228875
 WO02094250
 WO03006475
 US6043060
 US6268490
 US6770748
 US6639051
 US2002125241
 US2003105309
 US2003125241
 US2002147332
 US2004244840
 US2005203042
 US3687808
 US6169177
 US6008366
 US6383811
 US5844107
 US6077835
 US6177274
 US6287591
 US6447752
 US6447753
 US6440743
 US7138105
 US2006093660
 US5108921
 US5416016
 US5635382
 US6291673
 WO02085908
 US6458382
 US6429200
 US2003099697
 US2004120997
 US2004131666
 US2005164963
 WO2006048329
 US6379966
 US6339067
 US5744335
 US2006014695
 WO03066054
 US2006051315
 WO2005094783
    - TSUJIMOTO, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 1440 - 1443
    - REED, CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, page 6529
    - YUNIS ET AL., NEW ENGLAND J. MED, vol. 320, page 1047
    - CAMPOS, BLOOD, (1993), vol. 81, pages 3091 - 3096
    - MCDONNELL, CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 6940 - 6944
    - LU, INT. J CANCER, (1993), vol. 53, pages 29 - 35
    - BONNER, LAB INVEST, (1993), vol. 68, page 43A
    - FREIREICH ET AL., CANCER CHEMOTHER. REP.,, (1966), vol. 50, page 219
    - "Periodic Table of the Elements, CAS version", Handbook of Chemistry and Physics, 75th ed., .
    - BOS, CANCER RES., (1989), vol. 49, pages 4682 - 4689
    - DASKA, ONCOGENE RES, (1990), vol. 5, pages 267 - 275
    - BROWN ET AL., ONCOGENE RES., (1989), vol. 4, pages 243 - 252
    - SAISON-BEHMOARAS ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 1111 - 1116
    - GRAY ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 577 - 580
    - SCHWAB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10460 - 10464
    - ROUSH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 276, pages 1192 - 1194
    - HYNES; STEM, BIOCHIM. ET BIOPHY. ACTA, (1994), vol. 1198, pages 165 - 184
    - DOUGALL ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1994), vol. 9, pages 2109 - 2123
    - LEE, NATURE, (1995), vol. 378, pages 394 - 398
    - COUSSENS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 1132 - 1139
    - YAMAMOTO ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 319, pages 230 - 234
    - HYNES; STEEN, BIOCHIM. ET BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1994), vol. 1198, pages 165 - 184
    - DIFIORE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 237, pages 178 - 182
    - HUDZIAK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7159 - 7163
    - SLAMON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 235, pages 177 - 182
    - SLAMON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 707 - 712
    - TAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, page 1199
    - COHEN, ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, page 30897
    - CHANG ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 14, page 561
    - WEINER ET AL., J. HEMATOTHERAPY, (1995), vol. 4, page 471
    - UENO ET AL., ONCOGONE, (1997), vol. 15, page 953
    - ZHANG ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1996), vol. 12, page 571
    - WITTERS ET AL., BREAST CANCER RES. AND TREATMENT, (1997), vol. 42, page 1
    - EBBINGHAUS ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1993), vol. 92, page 2433
    - PORUMB ET AL., CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, page 515
    - JUHL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, page 29482
    - PEGUES ET AL., CANCER LETT, (1997), vol. 117, page 73
    - CASALINI ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1997), vol. 72, page 631
    - COLOMER ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1994), vol. 70, page 819
    - WIECHEN ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 63, page 604
    - BERTRAM ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1994), vol. 200, page 661
    - LIU ET AL., ANTISENSE AND NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEVELOP., (1996), vol. 6, page 9
    - VAUGHN ET AL., NUC. ACIDS. RES., (1996), vol. 24, page 4558
    - BRYSCH ET AL., CANCER GENE THER., (1994), vol. 1, page 99
    - HAREL-BELLAN ET AL., J. IMMUN., (1988), vol. 140, pages 2431 - 2435
    - MARCU ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 61, pages 809 - 860
    - WATT ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 303, pages 725 - 728
    - BATTEY, CELL, (1983), vol. 34, pages 779 - 787
    - TSUJIMOTO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 1440 - 1443
    - REED ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, page 6529
    - YUNIS ET AL., NEW ENGLAND J. MED., vol. 320, page 1047
    - CAMPOS ET AL., BLOOD, (1993), vol. 81, pages 3091 - 3096
    - MCDONNEL, CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 6940 - 6944
    - LU ET AL., INT. J CANCER, (1993), vol. 53, pages 29 - 35
    - BONNER ET AL., LAB INVEST., (1993), vol. 68, page 43A
    - CAMPBELL ET AL., PROG. GROWTH FACTOR RES., (1989), vol. 1, page 13
    - MASSAGUE, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 21393 - 21396
    - PANDIELLA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 88, pages 1726 - 1730
    - PANDIELLA, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 5769 - 5773
    - WILDING ET AL., THE PROSTATE, (1989), vol. 15, pages 1 - 12
    - SANDGREN ET AL., CELL, (1990), vol. 61, pages 1121 - 1135
    - PULCIANI ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 300, page 539
    - FEIG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 223, page 698
    - RODENHUIS ET AL., NEW ENG. J. MED., (1987), vol. 317, page 929
    - YANEZ ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1987), vol. 1, page 315
    - SETO, M., EMBO J., (1988), vol. 7, pages 123 - 131
    - HECKMAN, C.A. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 3898 - 3908
    - TSUJIMOTO, Y. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (1987), vol. 84, pages 1329 - 1331
    - YONETANI, N. ET AL., JPN. J CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 92, pages 933 - 940
    - EHRLICK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1981), vol. 212, pages 1350 - 1357
    - DOERFLER, ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 52, pages 93 - 124
    - CHRISTMAN, CURR. TOP. MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 108, pages 49 - 78
    - CEDAR, CELL, (1988), vol. 34, pages 5503 - 5513
    - TATE ET AL., CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEV., (1993), vol. 3, pages 225 - 231
    - CHRISTMAN ET AL., Virus Strategies, VCH, (1993), pages 319 - 333
    - CHRISTMAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 7347 - 7351
    - JONES ET AL., ADV. CANCER RES, (1983), vol. 40, pages 1 - 30
    - NAMBU ET AL., JPN. J. CANCER (GANN, (1987), vol. 78, pages 696 - 704
    - FEINBERG ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN, (1983), vol. 111, pages 47 - 54
    - CHEAH ET AL., JNCI, (1984), vol. 73, pages 1057 - 1063
    - BHAVE ET AL., CARCINOGENESIS (LOND, (1988), vol. 9, pages 343 - 348
    - GOETZ, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 187 - 290
    - WAINFAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 2071S - 2077S
    - DIZIK ET AL., CARCINOGENESIS, (1991), vol. 12, pages 1307 - 1312
    - WAINFAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1989), vol. 49, pages 4094 - 4097
    - NIELSEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, page 1497
    - NEILSEN, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1999), vol. 313, pages 156 - 164
    - SCH6NING ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 290, pages 1347 - 51
    - WANG ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 8595 - 8602
    - VEBEURE ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2001), vol. 29, pages 4941 - 4947
    - STEFFENS ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, pages 11548 - 11549
    - MAURINSH ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM, (1997), vol. 62, pages 2861 - 71
    - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 120, pages 5381 - 94
    - ALLART ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1999), pages 6527 - 46
    - SCHARER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 117, pages 6623 - 24
    - FROEHLER; RICCA, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 114, pages 8230 - 32
    - HANCOCK ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES, vol. 21, pages 3485 - 91
    - HEASMAN, DEV. BIOL., (2002), vol. 243, pages 209 - 214
    - MARTIN ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1995), vol. 78, page 486
    - DITCHFIELD ET AL., J. CELL. BIOL., (2003), vol. 161, pages 267 - 80
    - HAAF ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (2003), vol. 161, pages 281 - 94
    - VANKAYALAPATI H ET AL., MOL. CANCER THER, (2003), vol. 2, pages 283 - 9
    - N.S. RADIN, BIOCHEM J, (2003), vol. 371, pages 243 - 56
    - D.E. MODRAK ET AL., MOL. CANCER THER, (2006), vol. 5, pages 200 - 208
    - K. DESAI ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2002), vol. 1585, pages 188 - 92
    - C.P. REYNOLDS ET AL., CANCER LETT, (2004), vol. 206, pages 169 - 80
    - GILLIES ET AL., MOL. PHANN., (2005), vol. 2, pages 129 - 3 8
    - CHOI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 474 - 80
    - JOESTER ET AL., ANGEW CHEM INT. ED. ENGL., (2003), vol. 42, pages 1486 - 90
    - LIU ET AL., POLYM CHEM, (1999), vol. 37, pages 3492 - 3503
    - LOUP ET AL., CHEM EUR J, (1999), vol. 5, pages 3644 - 50
    - OHASAKI ET AL., BIOCONJUG CHEM, (2002), vol. 13, pages 510 - 17
    - SHAH ET AL., INT. J. PHARM, (2000), vol. 208, pages 41 - 48
    - TACK ET AL., J. DRUG TRAGET, (2006), vol. 14, pages 69 - 86
    - DUFES ET AL., ADV. DRUG DEL. REV, (2005), vol. 57, pages 2177 - 2202
    - SVENSON; TOMALIA, ADV. DRUG DEL. REV., (2005), vol. 57, pages 2106 - 29
    - DISCHER ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 967 - 73
    - TORCHILIN, CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI, (2004), vol. 61, pages 2549 - 59
    - TAUBERT ET AL., CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL, (2004), vol. 8, pages 598 - 603
    - LEE ET AL., PHARM. RES., (2005), vol. 22, pages 1 - 10
    - GAUCHER ET AL., J. CONTROL. REL, (2005), vol. 109, pages 169 - 88
    - DUFRESNE ET AL., Gumy, (2003), vol. 96, pages 87 - 102
    - MOGHIMI, .M.; SZEBENI, J, PROG. LIPID RES., (2003), vol. 42, pages 463 - 78
    - LI, W. ET AL., GENE MED., (2005), vol. 7, pages 67 - 79
    - LI, W. ET AL., J. GENE MED., (2005), vol. 7, pages 67 - 79
    - MUKHERJEE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, pages 15619 - 27
    - BANERJEE ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2004), vol. 112, pages 693 - 700
    - RUYSSCHAERT, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, pages 6242 - 47
    - YANG ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 59, pages 781 - 786
    - GLINSKII ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 63, pages 4239 - 4243
    - KALIKIN ET AL., CANCER BIOLOGY AND THERAPY, (2003), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 17 - 21
    - AL-KATIB, AM ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 4, pages 1305 - 1314
    - MOHAMMAD, R ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 8, pages 1277 - 1283
    - MOHAMMAD, RM ET AL., MOL. CANCER THER., (2005), vol. 4, pages 13 - 21
    - MOHAMMAD, RM ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 6, pages 4950 - 4956