blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2975327

EP2975327 - ASSEMBLY UNIT COMPRISING A HOTPLATE AND STEAM EXTRACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2024New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bruckbauer, Wilhelm
Marktplatz 21a
83115 Neubeuern / DE
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Königstraße 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[2016/03]
Application number, filing date15177616.828.04.2012
[2016/03]
Priority number, dateDE20112005698U28.04.2011         Original published format: DE 202011005698 U
[2016/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2975327
Date:20.01.2016
Language:DE
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2975327
Date:11.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2015
ClassificationIPC:F24C15/20
[2016/03]
CPC:
F24C15/2042 (EP,CN,US); F24C15/10 (CN); F24C15/2035 (CN,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:MONTAGEEINHEIT MIT KOCHFELD UND DUNSTABZUGSVORRICHTUNG[2016/03]
English:ASSEMBLY UNIT COMPRISING A HOTPLATE AND STEAM EXTRACTOR[2016/03]
French:UNITÉ DE MONTAGE AVEC ZONE DE CUISSON ET DISPOSITIF D'ASPIRATION DE BUÉE[2016/03]
Examination procedure21.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
23.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2017Observations by third parties
20.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2017Observations by third parties
10.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
29.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2017Fee for grant paid
01.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
12.09.2017Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12733398.7  / EP2702329
Divisional application(s)EP17184069.7  / EP3282197
EP17197091.6  / EP3287702
EP20216989.2  / EP3828469
EP21168165.5  / EP3869107
EP22157724.0  / EP4019851
EP23165982.2  / EP4224071
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.10.2017  14.02.2020  WITHDRAWN
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
 02  10.07.2018  16.08.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Elica S.p.A.
Via Ermanno Casoli 2
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Opponent's representative
Perani & Partners S.p.A.
Piazza Armando Diaz, 7
20123 Milano / IT
 03  11.07.2018  16.08.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Miele & Cie. KG
Carl-Miele-Str. 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2020/13]
Former [2018/33]
Opponent(s)01  27.10.2017  02.11.2017  ADMISSIBLE
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
 02  10.07.2018    ADMISSIBLE
Elica S.p.A.
Via Ermanno Casoli 2
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Opponent's representative
Perani & Partners S.p.A.
Piazza Armando Diaz, 7
20123 Milano / IT
 03  11.07.2018    ADMISSIBLE
Miele & Cie. KG
Carl-Miele-Str. 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2017/49]
Opponent(s)01  27.10.2017  02.11.2017  ADMISSIBLE
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
23.08.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.03.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
23.06.2020Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.10.2023Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.01.2024Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.03.2024Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Appeal following opposition02.09.2020Appeal received No.  T1773/20
03.11.2020Statement of grounds filed
20.10.2023Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.01.2024Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
02.09.2020Appeal received No.  T1773/20
30.10.2020Statement of grounds filed
20.10.2023Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.01.2024Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
19.10.2020Appeal received No.  T1773/20
19.10.2020Statement of grounds filed
20.10.2023Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.01.2024Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
20.10.2023Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.10.2017
CY11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MK11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
[2020/34]
Former [2020/31]CY11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MK11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/52]EE11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/43]EE11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MT11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/40]EE11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/37]EE11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/24]HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/22]LT11.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[IAY]US2674991  (SCHAEFER HAROLD W) [I] 1,2,4,6-8,11-15 * figures 1, 2, 3 * [A] 3 [Y] 5,9,10;
 [A]US3587555  (CEROLA JOSEPH J) [A] 1* figure 7 *;
 [X]US6455818  (ARNTZ TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO2007134500  (XIA ZHISHENG [CN]) [Y] 5 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE202009008286U  (BRUCKBAUER WILHELM [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * figures 18,25 *
ExaminationUS2005088128
 DE202011005698U
OppositionUS2674991
 US3367320
 US3587555
 US5190026
 US6455818
 US2005088128
 US2007023420
 WO2007134500
 EP1944553
 DE202009008286U
 DE202011005698U
 WO2012146237
 EP2975327
 US4899028
 JPH0970360
 US2011132900
    - "Verkaufshandbuch 2010", Häcker Küchen, (20100100), pages 1-6,24 - 34, XP055502720
    - Nolte, "Küchen", Verkaufsunterlagen
    - Miele, "Die Miele KÜCHE", PUNKTESYSTEM, (20090400), XP055502729
    - Poggenpohl, "Küchen", Verkaufsunterlagen 2008, pages 1-2,217 - 218,271, XP055503770
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.