Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2953365

EP2953365 - MOVING IMAGE CODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/50]MOVING IMAGE CODING DEVICE AND METHOD
[2018/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SK Planet Co., Ltd.
11, Euljiro, 2-ga
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-999 / KR
[2018/27]
Former [2015/50]For all designated states
SK Planet Co., Ltd.
11, Euljiro, 2-ga
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-999 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / BAE, Tae Moon
1401 Duseong 2-cha
Taejeon-dong
Buk-gu
702-260 Daegu / KR
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[2018/27]
Former [2015/50]Thorniley, Peter
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15178091.311.05.2009
[2015/50]
Priority number, dateKR2008007841011.08.2008         Original published format: KR 20080078410
[2015/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2953365
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2953365
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/43, H04N19/436, H04N19/523
[2015/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/13]
Former [2015/50]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BEWEGTBILDCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/09]
English:MOVING IMAGE CODING DEVICE[2018/09]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE D'IMAGE ANIMÉE[2018/09]
Former [2015/50]BEWEGTBILDCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN
Former [2015/50]MOVING IMAGE CODING DEVICE AND METHOD
Former [2015/50]DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE ANIMÉE
Examination procedure17.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/13]
03.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2017
19.10.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
02.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2018Fee for grant paid
24.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09806778.8  / EP2330826
Opposition(s)05.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/24]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
NO04.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL04.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1675406  (ST MICROELECTRONICS INC [US]) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0075] *;
 [I]US2007165716  (KITAMURA SHINJI [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0104]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0110]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0112]; figures 4a,4b *;
 [X]  - DEBES E ET AL, "Efficient exploitation of parallelism in general purpose processor-based systems for image and video processing applications", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 21-1-2002 - 23-1-2002; SAN JOSE,, (20020121), XP030080562 [X] 1-8 * page 668, paragraph 2.1 - page 669; figure 1 * * page 670, paragraph 2.1.2 - page 671, paragraph 3.1 * * page 672, paragraph 3.1.1; figure 4 * * page 676, paragraph 4.2 - page 677 *
 [I]  - SEBASTIAN FLUEGEL ET AL, "A Highly Parallel Sub-Pel Accurate Motion Estimator for H.264", 2006 IEEE WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING : VICTORIA, BC, CANADA, 3 - 6 OCTOBER 2006, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20061001), ISBN 978-0-7803-9751-4, pages 387 - 390, XP031011088 [I] 1-8 * page 387, column 2, paragraph I * * paragraph [III.A] - paragraph [III.B]; figure 3 *