Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2983135

EP2983135 - DETERMINING OPTIMAL STATES FOR A VARYING MARGIN LINE IN A SEQUENCE OF IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2017  [2017/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Schlosser, Markus
Hirschstr. 108
76137 Karlsruhe / DE
02 / Hoerentrup, Jobst
Neustadtstr. 4
30974 Wennigsen / DE
03 / Sorgi, Lorenzo
Gehägestr. 20 K
30655 Hannover / DE
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas
Deutsche Thomson OHG
European Patent Operations
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date15178225.724.07.2015
[2016/06]
Priority number, dateEP2014030625808.08.2014         Original published format: EP 14306258
[2016/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2983135
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/00, H04N5/272
[2016/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERMITTELN OPTIMALER ZUSTÄNDE FÜR EINE VERÄNDERLICHE GRENZLINIE IN EINER BILDSEQUENZ[2016/06]
English:DETERMINING OPTIMAL STATES FOR A VARYING MARGIN LINE IN A SEQUENCE OF IMAGES[2016/06]
French:DETERMINATION D'ETATS OPTIMALS POUR UNE LIGNE DE BORD VARIABLE DANS UNE SEQUENCE D'IMAGES[2016/06]
Examination procedure11.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/06]
16.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/06]
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - ROTHER C ET AL, "GrabCut - interactive foreground extraction using iterated graph cuts", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS (TOG), ACM, US, (200408), vol. 23, no. 3, doi:10.1145/1015706.1015720, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 309 - 314, XP002340109 [Y] 1-11 * abstract, sections 1-5, Figs. 1-8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1015706.1015720
 [A]  - PEDRO F. FELZENSZWALB ET AL, "Distance Transforms of Sample Functions", THEORY OF COMPUTING, (2012), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.4086/toc.2012.v008a019, pages 415 - 428, XP055169285 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4086/toc.2012.v008a019
 [Y]  - JUE WANG ET AL, "Interactive video cutout", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, (200507), vol. 24, no. 3, doi:10.1145/1073204.1073233, ISSN 0730-0301, page 585, XP055012236 [Y] 1-11 * abstract,sections 1-8, Figs. 1-11 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1073204.1073233
 [Y]  - MARTEAU P F ET AL, "Speeding up simplification of polygonal curves using nested approximations", PATTERN ANALYSIS AND APPLICATIONS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, LO, (20080807), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 1433-755X, pages 367 - 375, XP019742962 [Y] 1-11 * abstract, sections 1-3, Table 1 *
by applicant   - C. ROTHER ET AL., "GrabCut: interactive foreground extraction using iterated graph cuts", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, (2004), vol. 23, pages 309 - 314
    - P. F. FELZENSZWALB ET AL., "Distance Transforms of Sampled Functions", THEORY OF COMPUTING, (2012), vol. 8, pages 415 - 428
    - WANG ET AL., "Interactive Video Cutout", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, (2005), vol. 24, pages 585 - 594