Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2978266

EP2978266 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOW POWER OPERATION UTILIZING MULTIPLE ADCS WITH DIFFERENT PRECISIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/04]METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR LOW POWER OPERATION UTILIZING MULTIPLE ADCS WITH DIFFERENT PRECISIONS
[2019/17]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2019/37]
Former [2016/04]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / RAMAKRISHNA, Sudhir
5708 Arrow Point Drive
Plano
Collin County, TX Texas 75093 / US
 [2016/04]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/37]
Former [2016/04]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15178307.324.07.2015
[2016/04]
Priority number, dateUS201462029205P25.07.2014         Original published format: US 201462029205 P
US20151462244913.02.2015         Original published format: US201514622449
[2016/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2978266
Date:27.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2978266
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02, H03M1/00, H03M1/12, H04L25/00, H04L25/02
[2016/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR NIEDRIGLEISTUNGSBETRIEB MIT MEHREREN ADCS MIT VERSCHIEDENEN PRÄZISIONEN[2016/04]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOW POWER OPERATION UTILIZING MULTIPLE ADCS WITH DIFFERENT PRECISIONS[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UN FONCTIONNEMENT À FAIBLE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE UTILISANT DE MULTIPLES CONVERTISSEURS ANALOGIQUE/NUMÉRIQUE À DIFFÉRENTES PRÉCISIONS[2019/17]
Former [2016/04]METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR LOW POWER OPERATION UTILIZING MULTIPLE ADCS WITH DIFFERENT PRECISIONS
Former [2016/04]PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR UN FONCTIONNEMENT À FAIBLE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE UTILISANT DE MULTIPLES CONVERTISSEURS ANALOGIQUE/NUMÉRIQUE À DIFFÉRENTES PRÉCISIONS
Examination procedure24.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/04]
25.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2019Fee for grant paid
31.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2012076229  (BROBSTON MICHAEL LEE [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0049] , [0051] , [0054] - [0063] * * figures 1-3,6,7 *;
 [Y]GB2440988  (ITI SCOTLAND LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, lines 7-15, 26-33 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 30 * * figure 3 *;
 [Y]US8335484  (ARAD OREN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, lines 19,20,31-35,44-49 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 67 * * column 9, lines 13-27 * * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [I]WO0118970  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 8-16 * * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 30 * * page 6, lines 5-8 * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 20 * * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 26 * * page 13, lines 15-17 * * figures 1A,1B,6A *;
 [I]US2006215590  (SHARMA SRIDHAR G [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0033] , [0034] , [0075] , [0076] * * figure 2 *
by applicant   - JOHN G. PROAKIS, Digital Communications