Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3078789

EP3078789 - RETAINING MECHANISM FOR TELESCOPING POLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.11.2017  [2017/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CPA Pool Products, Inc.
31, boul. de la Seigneurie
Bureau 206
Blainville, Québec J7C 4G6 / CA
[2016/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Larouche, Annie
480 Preston
Mascouche, Québec J7L 3V3 / CA
 [2016/41]
Representative(s)Gill, Siân Victoria , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/41]Cowley, Catherine Mary , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date15178962.529.07.2015
[2016/41]
Priority number, dateUS20151467921106.04.2015         Original published format: US201514679211
[2016/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3078789
Date:12.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:E04H4/16, A46B3/00, B08B1/00, B25G3/18, F16B7/04
[2016/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:HALTEMECHANISMUS FÜR TELESKOPMAST[2016/41]
English:RETAINING MECHANISM FOR TELESCOPING POLE[2016/41]
French:MÉCANISME DE RETENUE POUR PERCHE TÉLESCOPIQUE[2016/41]
Examination procedure13.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/44]
22.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/44]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2886988  (HO CHENG GARDEN TOOLS CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1-9 * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 19; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US4247216  (PANSINI ANDREW L) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 33; figures 1-5 *;
 [XA]CA2785484  (LEE YU CHIEH [TW]) [X] 5-9 * page 6, line 14 - page 11, line 22; figures 2,3,5,6 * [A] 1-3;
 [XA]US2006062632  (JANG JUNG-WOO [KR]) [X] 5-9 * page 1, column r, paragraph 16 - page 2, column l, paragraph 27; figures 2-7 * [A] 1-3