Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2981104

EP2981104 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2016/05]
Inventor(s)01 / BAN, Dae-hyun
Apt. 115-806
22 Dongjak-daero 39-gil
Dongjak-gu
Seoul / KR
 [2016/05]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/05]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15179391.631.07.2015
[2016/05]
Priority number, dateKR2014009863331.07.2014         Original published format: KR 20140098633
KR2015002272013.02.2015         Original published format: KR 20150022720
KR2015004499631.03.2015         Original published format: KR 20150044996
[2016/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2981104
Date:03.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/02, H04W4/14, G06F17/30, // H04L12/58
[2016/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/37]
Former [2016/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INFORMATIONEN[2016/05]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION[2016/05]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'INFORMATIONS[2016/05]
Examination procedure03.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/37]
05.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2008100690  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 23 * * page 7, line 3 - page 16, line 20 * * figures 1-9 *;
 [X]US2013174058  (KAUL BHAVUK [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 1,2, 4,8-13 *