Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3002847

EP3002847 - HIGH VOLTAGE DIRECT CURRENT TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSIS Co., Ltd.
127 LS-ro
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-848 / KR
[2016/14]
Inventor(s)01 / CHOI, Yong Kil
c/o LSIS Co., Ltd.
127, LS-ro, Dongan-Gu
431-848 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / CHOI, Ho Seok
c/o LSIS Co., Ltd.
127, LS-ro, Dongan-Gu
431-848 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2016/14]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2016/14]
Application number, filing date15179611.704.08.2015
[2016/14]
Priority number, dateKR2014013220001.10.2014         Original published format: KR 20140132200
[2016/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3002847
Date:06.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/36
[2016/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/45]
Former [2016/14]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHSPANNUNGS-GLEICHSTROM-ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM[2016/14]
English:HIGH VOLTAGE DIRECT CURRENT TRANSMISSION SYSTEM[2016/14]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION À COURANT CONTINU HAUTE TENSION[2016/14]
Examination procedure28.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/45]
01.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/03]
07.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2014111995  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0077] - [0144]; figures 1,2,3,9,17,18,33 *;
 [E]US2015355666  (ICHINO KIYOHISA [JP]) [E] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [0077] - [0144]; figures 1,2,3,9,17,18,33 *;
 [X]US2010118574  (BOURGEAU EDWARD P [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] - [0046]; figures 1,2,9 *;
 [X]WO2007028350  (SIEMENS AKITENGESELLSCHAFT [DE]; DAVIES MARK [DE]; DORN JOERG [DE]; HU) [X] 1 * page 14, line 30 - page 16, line 34; figure 1 *