Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3002847 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3002847



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 148
07.12.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
08.10.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
07.09.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
04.04.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.04.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
21.12.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
21.12.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
01.09.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
01.09.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.08.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
28.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
28.09.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
28.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
28.09.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.04.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.03.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.02.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.02.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 2
01.02.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
01.02.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
19.01.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
19.10.2015 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
13.10.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
04.08.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
04.08.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
04.08.2015 Description Search / examination 28
04.08.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Drawings Search / examination 6
04.08.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5