Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3002847


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.12.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
09.10.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
06.09.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
12.04.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.01.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.09.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.09.2017 First examination report
01.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.10.2016 Amendment by applicant
07.10.2016 Request for examination filed published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
07.10.2016 Change - designated states published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
05.04.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
04.08.2015 Change - representative