Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2983341

EP2983341 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYNCHRONIZING APPLICATIONS OF AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / SEO, Young-Su
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / PARK, Joon-Ho
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15179659.604.08.2015
[2016/06]
Priority number, dateKR2014010036305.08.2014         Original published format: KR 20140100363
[2016/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2983341
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08
[2016/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/38]
Former [2016/06]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SYNCHRONISIERUNG DER APPLIKATIONEN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2016/06]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYNCHRONIZING APPLICATIONS OF AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE[2016/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SYNCHRONISATION D' APPLICATIONS D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE[2016/06]
Examination procedure10.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/38]
29.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2013055273  (HONG YOUNGKI [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0101] * * figures 10,11 *;
 [X]WO2011066162  (MOTOROLA MOBILITY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 11 - line 24 * * page 8, line 30 - page 10, line 6 * * page 15, line 6 - line 17 * * figures 3,4 * * page 4, line 2 - line 14 *;
 [X]US2012230236  (KERT KAIDO [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 2-6 *;
 [I]WO2012071283  (LUNA MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0130] * * figures 4b, 8,9 *;
 [A]US2014089933  (LIOY MARCELLO V [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0038] *