Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3043368

EP3043368 - BYPASS SWITCH FOR HVDC TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSIS Co., Ltd.
127 LS-ro
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-848 / KR
[2016/28]
Inventor(s)01 / JUNG, Teag Sun
c/o LSIS Co., Ltd.
1026-6, Hogye-Dong, Dongan-Gu
431-080 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR
 [2016/28]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2016/28]
Application number, filing date15179780.005.08.2015
[2016/28]
Priority number, dateKR2015000438012.01.2015         Original published format: KR 20150004380
[2016/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3043368
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3043368
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01H39/00
[2016/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/48]
Former [2016/28]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ÜBERBRÜCKUNGSSCHALTER FÜR HOCHSPANNUNGSGLEICHSTROMÜBERTRAGUNG[2016/28]
English:BYPASS SWITCH FOR HVDC TRANSMISSION[2016/28]
French:COMMUTATEUR DE DÉRIVATION POUR TRANSMISSION HVDC[2016/28]
Examination procedure20.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2016Examination requested  [2016/48]
16.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2017Fee for grant paid
06.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
[2019/15]
Former [2018/52]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[IA]WO2009092621  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; BURGER JENS [DE]; DORN JOERG [DE]; KUEBEL THOMAS [DE]) [I] 1,10-15 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 5 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 24 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-9;
 [IA]WO2010060790  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; ANHEUER MATHIAS [DE]; DORN JOERG [DE]; FARTUSCHNJA AN) [I] 1,10-15 * page 9, line 13 - page 11, line 12 * * figure 1 * [A] 2-9
by applicantUS8390968