Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2983243

EP2983243 - CABLE ASSEMBLY HAVING A GROUNDED CABLE HARNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2017  [2017/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2016/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Rossman, Jared Evan
6050 Lewisberry Road
Dover, PA 17315 / US
02 / Lachman, Julia Anne
1382 Rosepointe Drive
York, PA 17404 / US
03 / Simpson, Jeffrey Stewart
8 Ginger Drive
Mechanicsburg, PA 17050 / US
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date15179882.405.08.2015
[2016/06]
Priority number, dateUS20141445450707.08.2014         Original published format: US201414454507
[2016/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2983243
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/04, H01R13/6592, // H01R9/03
[2016/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:KABELANORDNUNG MIT EINEM GEERDETEN KABELBAUM[2016/06]
English:CABLE ASSEMBLY HAVING A GROUNDED CABLE HARNESS[2016/06]
French:ENSEMBLE CÂBLE POSSÉDANT UN HARNAIS DE CÂBLE MIS À LA TERRE[2016/06]
Examination procedure11.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/06]
23.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/06]
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE102009049133  (BELDEN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0011] , [0014] - [0016] - [0 18] * * figure 1 * [I] 4,6,8;
 [X]WO9106961  (RAYCHEM LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2002002005  (WHYBROW DAVID ERNEST [GB]) [A] 4 * paragraph [0013] * * figure 1 *