blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3130716

EP3130716 - WALL CONSTRUCTION PANEL AND WALL BUILDING SYSTEM FOR EXHIBITION STAND CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syma Intercontinental AG
Panoramastrasse 19
9533 Kirchberg / CH
[2017/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Züllig, Kurt
Rosenbergstrasse 23
9533 Kirchberg / CH
 [2017/07]
Representative(s)Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 30 02 08
51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2017/43]
Former [2017/07]Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 02 08
51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date15180426.710.08.2015
[2017/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3130716
Date:15.02.2017
Language:DE
[2017/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3130716
Date:25.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2016
ClassificationIPC:E04B2/74, // E04B2/76
[2017/07]
CPC:
E04B2/766 (EP,CN,US); E04B2/72 (US); E04B2/74 (US);
E04B2/7407 (US); E04B2/7425 (EP,CN,US); E04B2/7836 (US);
E04B2/789 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/07]
TitleGerman:WANDBAUPLATTE UND WANDBAUSYSTEM FÜR DEN MESSEBAU[2017/07]
English:WALL CONSTRUCTION PANEL AND WALL BUILDING SYSTEM FOR EXHIBITION STAND CONSTRUCTION[2017/07]
French:PANNEAU DE MUR ET SYSTEME DE PANNEAUX DE MUR POUR LA CONSTRUCTION DE STAND D'EXPOSITION[2017/21]
Former [2017/07]PANNEAU DE MUR ET SYSTÈME DE PANNEAUX DE MUR POUR LA CONSTRUCTION DE STAND D'EXPOSITION
Examination procedure10.08.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.02.2016Examination requested  [2017/07]
22.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2017Fee for grant paid
13.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.08.2015
AL25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MK25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
PT25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
TR25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2020/34]
Former [2020/31]HU10.08.2015
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MK25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
PT25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
TR25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2020/30]HU10.08.2015
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
PT25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
TR25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2020/28]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
PT25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
TR25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2020/16]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
TR25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2019/15]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/43]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/39]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE202010006529U  (HESTEX SYSTEMS BV [NL]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0015] - [0024] - [0026]; figures 1-6 *
by applicantDE202010006529U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.