blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3130707

EP3130707 - GUIDE BLADE FOR AN OVERFLOW STRUCTURE TO BE PLACED ON A VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Danmarks Tekniske Universitet
Anker Engelunds Vej 101 A
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
[2017/07]
Inventor(s)01 / JENSEN, Jacob Hjelmager
Slotsgade 71, 1.tv
DK-3400 Hillerød / DK
 [2017/07]
Representative(s)Zacco Denmark A/S
Arne Jacobsens Allé 15
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
[2017/07]
Application number, filing date15180713.812.08.2015
[2017/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3130707
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2016
ClassificationIPC:E02F7/04, B01D21/00, B01D21/24, E02F7/06
[2017/07]
CPC:
E02F7/04 (EP); B01D21/2444 (EP); E02F7/065 (EP);
B01D2221/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEITSCHAUFEL FÜR EINE AN EINEN BEHÄLTER ANZUBRINGENDE ÜBERLAUFSTRUKTUR[2017/07]
English:GUIDE BLADE FOR AN OVERFLOW STRUCTURE TO BE PLACED ON A VESSEL[2017/07]
French:AUBE DIRECTRICE POUR UNE STRUCTURE DE TROP-PLEIN DESTINÉE À ÊTRE PLACÉE SUR UN RÉCIPIENT[2017/07]
Examination procedure17.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/06]
21.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/06]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]NL1003317C  (BOSKALIS BV BAGGERMAATSCHAPPIJ [NL]) [X] 1,2,4,12,14 * figure 3 to 5 * * figure 1 to 5 *;
 [X]WO2011028129  (VIKING DREDGING AS [NO], et al) [X] 1,3,12-14 * figures 1, 2 and 4 *;
 [X]JP2003002285  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,3,12,14 * figures 1, 2 and 4 * * figure 7 *;
 [X]SU1182124  (GOMBERG PETR V, et al) [X] 1,12-14 * figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0679422  (HOLLANDSCHE BETONGROEP NV [NL]) [X] 1,12-14 * figure 1 to 4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.