blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3130797

EP3130797 - WIND TURBINE BLADE WITH ROOT END FLANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.03.2018  [2018/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LM WP Patent Holding A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
[2017/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Ejlersen, Flemming
Stadion Allé 16
7100 Vejle / DK
02 / van den Berg, René
Hobbemaplantsoen 36
1701 KG Heerhugowaard / NL
03 / Roberts, David
Veemkade 544
1019 HE Amsterdam / NL
04 / Keesmekers, Eddy
Zuiderkerkplein 2
1601 HK Enkhuizen / NL
 [2017/07]
Application number, filing date15180938.113.08.2015
[2017/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3130797
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2016
ClassificationIPC:F03D7/02, F03D1/06
[2017/07]
CPC:
F03D1/0658 (EP,US); F03D1/0633 (US); F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F03D17/00 (EP,US); F03D7/0224 (EP,US); F03D80/70 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL MIT WURZELENDFLANSCH[2017/07]
English:WIND TURBINE BLADE WITH ROOT END FLANGE[2017/07]
French:PALE D'ÉOLIENNE DOTÉE DE BRIDES D'EXTRÉMITÉ[2017/07]
Examination procedure17.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/10]
10.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2004165987  (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]);
 [A]DE102004017323  (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]);
 [A]DE202007008066U  (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]);
 [A]EP2511522  (BAUMER INNOTEC AG [CH]);
 [XYI]US2013216394  (LEONARD JAY F [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.