Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2984987

EP2984987 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MARKING OF FLUOROSCOPE FIELD-OF-VIEW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/07]MARKING OF FLUOROSCOPE FIELD-OF-VIEW
[2017/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd.
4 Hatnufa Street
2066717 Yokneam / IL
[2016/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ZINO, Eliahu
Hamachtarot 78
P.B. 137
3030000 Atlit / IL
02 / SUSEL, Pesach
32 Ester Rabin St.
3491793 Haifa / IL
03 / ZIGELMAN, Gil
6 Giborey Ghetto Varsha St.
3499406 Haifa / IL
04 / HASKEL, Eran
Haoranim 15
Apt. 3
2702208 Kiryat Bialik / IL
05 / ADI, Liav Moshe
67 Berl Catzenelson St.
3276617 Haifa / IL
 [2016/07]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2016/07]
Application number, filing date15181132.014.08.2015
[2016/07]
Priority number, dateUS20141446044515.08.2014         Original published format: US201414460445
[2016/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2984987
Date:17.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2984987
Date:04.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/06, A61B6/00
[2016/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
Former [2016/07]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR MARKIERUNG DES FLUOROSKOPSICHTFELDS[2017/39]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MARKING OF FLUOROSCOPE FIELD-OF-VIEW[2017/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MARQUAGE DE CHAMP DE VISION DE FLUOROSCOPE[2017/39]
Former [2016/07]MARKIERUNG DES FLUOROSKOPSICHTFELDS
Former [2016/07]MARKING OF FLUOROSCOPE FIELD-OF-VIEW
Former [2016/07]MARQUAGE DE CHAMP DE VISION DE FLUOROSCOPE
Examination procedure11.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/20]
21.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2018Fee for grant paid
23.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE14.08.2018
LU14.08.2018
MT14.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/33]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
IE14.08.2018
LU14.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
LU14.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
LU14.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP2823763  (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [XP] 1-8 * paragraphs [0032] , [0046] , [0050] *;
 [I]EP1929956  (BIOSENSE WEBSTER INC [US]) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0029] - [0035] - [0050] , [0061] *;
 [A]US5255680  (DARROW ROBERT D [US] ET AL) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 23 * * column 4, line 29 - line 34 * * column 7, line 26 - line 47 *;
 [A]US2006153468  (SOLF TORSTEN [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0037] *;
 [A]US2003231789  (WILLIS N PARKER [US] ET AL) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0083] , [0091] *
by applicantUS8515527
 US7327872
 US5391199
 US6690963
 US6484118
 US6239724
 US6618612
 US6332089
 WO9605768
 US2002065455
 US2003120150
 US2004068178