Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2987511

EP2987511 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED RECOVERY OF WHITE BLOOD CELLS AFTER PRODUCING A LEUKO-REDUCED BLOOD PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.08.2016
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fenwal, Inc.
Three Corporate Drive
Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US
[2016/08]
Inventor(s)01 / WEGENER, Christopher J.
601 Buckingham Place
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
02 / KUSTERS, Benjamin E.
4130 110th Street
Pleasant Prairie, IL 53158 / US
 [2016/08]
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2016/08]
Application number, filing date15181322.718.08.2015
[2016/08]
Priority number, dateUS20141446309519.08.2014         Original published format: US201414463095
[2016/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2987511
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/02, A61M1/34, A61M1/36
[2016/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/36]
Former [2016/08]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON WEISSEN BLUTZELLEN NACH HERSTELLUNG EINES LEUKO-REDUZIERTEN BLUTPRODUKTS[2016/08]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED RECOVERY OF WHITE BLOOD CELLS AFTER PRODUCING A LEUKO-REDUCED BLOOD PRODUCT[2016/08]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS AUTOMATISÉS DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE GLOBULES BLANCS APRÈS PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT SANGUIN À TENEUR RÉDUITE EN LEUCOCYTES[2016/08]
Examination procedure01.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]WO02056992  (BAXTER INT INC) [I] 1-10 * page 14, line 29 - page 15, line 17; figures 1,5,7,9 *;
 [A]EP2548591  (ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0006]; figure 5 *
by applicantUS5194145
    - AMYLYNN A. TELERON ET AL., "Blood donor white blood cell reduction filters as a source of human peripheral blood-derived endothelial progenitor cells", TRANSFUSION, (200501), vol. 45, no. 21