Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2989944

EP2989944 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING MILK FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Melitta Professional Coffee Solutions GmbH & Co., KG
Zechenstrasse 60
32429 Minden / DE
[2016/09]
Inventor(s)01 / BUCHHOLZ, Bernd
Bössel 7
32369 Rahden / DE
02 / DIESTER, Thomas
Zu den Brücken 24d
31675 Bückeburg / DE
 [2016/09]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2016/09]
Application number, filing date15181905.921.08.2015
[2016/09]
Priority number, dateDE20141011217826.08.2014         Original published format: DE102014112178
[2016/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2989944
Date:02.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2989944
Date:14.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/44
[2016/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/39]
Former [2016/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN VON MILCHSCHAUM[2016/09]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING MILK FOAM[2016/09]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MOUSSE DE LAIT[2016/09]
Examination procedure16.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/39]
02.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2017Fee for grant paid
04.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.08.2015
CY14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
MT14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE21.08.2017
LU21.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU21.08.2015
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
MT14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE21.08.2017
LU21.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
MT14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE21.08.2017
LU21.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE21.08.2017
LU21.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/34]CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE21.08.2017
LU21.08.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/18]CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2042063  (CAFINA AG) [X] 1-9,12 * paragraph [0015]; figure 1; claim 8 *;
 [X]EP2220972  (JURA ELEKTROAPPARATE AG [CH]) [X] 1-9,12 * paragraph [0051]; figure 3 *;
 [X]EP2294952  (SCHAERER AG) [X] 1,4,7,8,11,12 * figure 1; claims 2,4 *;
 [X]WO9100041  (NUOVA FAEMA SPA) [X] 1-3,7,8,12 * page 4, lines 16-18; figure 2 *
by applicantEP2298142
 DE102013104339